Whitmore v. Does 1-25, inclusive

Plaintiff: Marlon Whitmore
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01408
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 26 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
January 28, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Disclosure of Juvenile Case File of Marlon Whitmore filed by Charles Blount, Joseph Horsman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/28/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Charles Blount, Joseph Horsman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/28/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
August 21, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause re cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/21/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 26, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re cross-motion filed by defendants Blount and Horsman and plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/26/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
June 5, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
September 29, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hearing. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/29/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
October 10, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
June 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/12/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Whitmore v. Does 1-25, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Whitmore
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]