Gibson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
Plaintiff: Dorothy G. Gibson, Dorothy J. Smith, Arthur F. Faciane, Luther E. Johnson, Walter, Jr. R. Hicks, Mary S. Ocetnik, Mary K. Manning, Roy E. Brown, Joseph Ocetnik, Mary Hicks, Patricia A. Johnson, Brenda L. Faciane, Darnese Smith, Herman A. Wilcox, Stanley J. Barnett, William C. Barnes, Jeanette N. Kromis, Nelson Perez, Stephanie Perez, Tina R. Smith, Timothy Smith, Ralph A. Brodie, Barbara Brodie, Perry V. McGreck, Elizabeth Grant, Sue E. Hearon, Betty S. Shaffer, Joseph Shaffer, Emily C. Uriot, Leon Sweet, Janice Sweet, Letha Butcher, Tracy Butcher, Robert Pendergrast, Frederick L. Pletka, Therese M. Pletka, Billy J. Snyder, Rita C. Snyder, Valerie H. Pettie, Howard Spencer, Bobbie Spencer, Flora Becker, Mechelle B. Blackwell, Mary Jo Jenkins, Barbara M. Broussard, Tamme Ford, John D. Jesse, Louise E. Jesse, Robert E. Mills, Joy Mills, Bruce C. Swikert, Mary K. Swikert, Willa F. Houston, Barry Gorrevich, Belenda M. Buchanan, Kenneth F. Creutz, Phoebe Henry, Janet S. Hutchins, Ernest Rogers, Rae Rogers, Douglas T. Stolar, Patricia M. Stolar, Timothy R. Lee, Lorna H. Lee, Arvillia B. Montgomery, Helen F. Holmes, Sherry A. Ray, Zizo Caraballo, Anthony Cunningham and Deborah L. Cunningham
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01416
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 9 Motion to Stay; terminating 20 Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
July 9, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 6, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER MDL-2418: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, District of New Jersey. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 08/06/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gibson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy G. Gibson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J. Smith
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur F. Faciane
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther E. Johnson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter, Jr. R. Hicks
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S. Ocetnik
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K. Manning
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E. Brown
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ocetnik
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hicks
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Johnson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Faciane
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnese Smith
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman A. Wilcox
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley J. Barnett
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Barnes
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette N. Kromis
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Perez
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Perez
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina R. Smith
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Smith
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Brodie
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brodie
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry V. McGreck
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grant
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue E. Hearon
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty S. Shaffer
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Shaffer
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily C. Uriot
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Sweet
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Sweet
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letha Butcher
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Butcher
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pendergrast
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick L. Pletka
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese M. Pletka
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J. Snyder
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita C. Snyder
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie H. Pettie
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Spencer
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Spencer
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Becker
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle B. Blackwell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Jenkins
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara M. Broussard
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamme Ford
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Jesse
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise E. Jesse
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Mills
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Mills
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce C. Swikert
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K. Swikert
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willa F. Houston
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Gorrevich
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belenda M. Buchanan
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth F. Creutz
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoebe Henry
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S. Hutchins
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Rogers
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Rogers
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas T. Stolar
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M. Stolar
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Lee
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna H. Lee
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvillia B. Montgomery
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen F. Holmes
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry A. Ray
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zizo Caraballo
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cunningham
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Cunningham
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]