Lumos v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al

Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Jamie Lumos
Case Number: 3:2013cv01429
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granted 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue the case management conference of May 10, 2013 filed by Southwest Airlines Co.. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/16/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
September 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 MOTION SEEKING ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SET HEARING [Local Rule 7-11] [UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF SEEKING ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SET HEARING - Local Rule 7-11]. Motion (preliminary approval) Hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
October 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Certify Class [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT] filed by Jamie Lumos. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
March 21, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT] filed by Jamie Lumos, 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF R EASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ENHANCEMENTS AND CLAIM ADMINISTRATOR'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT] filed by Jamie Lumos. JUDGMENT/JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumos v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Represented By: Christina Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lumos
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]