Collins v. City of Oakland et al

Defendant: Antonio Acosta, Leo Bazile, County of Alameda, City of Oakland and Rick Cocanour
Plaintiff: Clayton Collins
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01493
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK, HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER, AND LEGAL STANDARDS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Legal Help Desk Flyer, # 3 Pro Se Litigant Handbook)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 8, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER (1) REGARDING 26 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO 11 THE COUNTY OF ALAMEDA'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) CONTINUING THE HEARING ON 11 12 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS to September 19, 2013. See order for details. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/8/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 20, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER (1) directing the United States Marshal to serve Leo Bazile and Antonio Acosta and (2) CONTINUING the hearing on the entity defendants' motions to dismiss. The court CONTINUES the hearing on the City of Oakland's and the County of Alameda's motions to dismiss to October 17, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/20/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
October 1, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING THE REPRESENTATION OF THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. The court ORDERS counsel for the City of Oakland and the County of Alameda to tell the court whether they also represent, or intend to represent, any of the individual defendants to this action. Counsel for the City of Oakland and the County of Alameda shall do so by filing short statements on the court's Electronic Case File by 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/1/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 4, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER (1) REGARDING THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' LEGAL REPRESENTATION AND (2) CONTINUING THE HEARING ON THE ENTITY DEFENDANTS' PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Although the court appreciates that this action has been delayed, given the situatio n with the individual defendants' legal representation and the court's need for the consent of all defendants, the court CONTINUES the hearing on the entity defendants' pending motions to dismiss from October 17, 2013 to 11:00 a.m. on December 19, 2013 in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. The court also ORDERS the City of Oakland to file a status update about the individual defendants' legal representation by October 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/4/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 18, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER (1) DIRECTING MR. BAZILE AND MR. ACOSTA TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO MR. COLLINS'S COMPLAINT AND (2) REGARDING THE SERVICE OF OFFICER COCANOUR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/18/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
November 13, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER (1) DIRECTING THE U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE OFFICER COCANOUR AND (2) CONTINUING THE HEARING ON 11 12 55 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearing on defendants' pending motions to dismiss remains is CONTINUED from December 19, 2013 to February 6, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Larurel Beeler on 11/13/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
February 3, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 11 12 55 65 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Mr. Collins's § 1983 claim, which is his only federal claim. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over his r emaining state law claims and DISMISSES them WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/3/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collins v. City of Oakland et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Acosta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Bazile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Cocanour
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]