Craigslist, Inc. v. Deuce Jackson, LLC et al

Defendant: Deuce Jackson, LLC and Michael Hanson
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01501
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING ECF FILING by Hon. William Alsup granting 13 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
July 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE. All parties must personally attend the case management conference. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/11/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
September 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 4, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
November 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DISCOVERY LETTER REQUEST re 23 Letter filed by Michael R Hanson, 24 Letter filed by Craigslist, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
January 6, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 26 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Craigslist, Inc.]. Responses due by NOON ON 1/7/2014. Two-hour meet-and-confer set for 8:30--10:30 AM 1/8/2014 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 1/8/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/6/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
February 7, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER COMPELLING MICHAEL A. HANSONS COMPLIANCE WITH THE JANUARY 8 ORDER by Judge Alsup re 26 Discovery Letter Brief; re 30 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COURT-APPOINTED MEDIATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
May 8, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigslist, Inc. v. Deuce Jackson, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deuce Jackson, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: James Patrick Corrigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]