Tobin v. City & County of San Francisco Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Patrick J Tobin
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco Police Department, Gregory P. Suhr, John Murphy and James Dudley
Case Number: 3:2013cv01504
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 4, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 15 Stipulation to Extend completion of mediation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 14 Motion for Reconsideration (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
January 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 1/23/2014; JOINT STATUS STATEMENT DUE 1/15/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/14. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Setting deadline for filing dispositive motions for 4/24/14; hearing date for dispositive motions for 5/29/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2014. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 26 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Patrick J Tobin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/14/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 1/23/14 STATUS CONFERENCE; RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 4/24/14; Status Report due by 4/17/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/22/14. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
October 16, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
November 18, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (clarifying deadline to seek leave to amend pleadings is 1/8/2015). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/18/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
March 9, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 45 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Patrick J Tobin. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/9/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
April 24, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED as to his claim under California Labor Code section 1102.5(b) by May 5, 2015. However, Plaintiff is advised that he must specify the law, rule, or regulation that supports his claim. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobin v. City & County of San Francisco Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J Tobin
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco Police Department
Represented By: Rafal Ofierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Suhr
Represented By: Rafal Ofierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Murphy
Represented By: Rafal Ofierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dudley
Represented By: Rafal Ofierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.