Howell et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
Plaintiff: Dennis S. Johnson and Kenneth R. Howell
Case Number: 3:2013cv01516
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO.'S MOTION TO STAY; VACATING MAY 17, 2013 HEARING; VACATING MAY 31, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
July 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE MDL PANEL No 2418, New Jersey. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis S. Johnson
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Howell
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]