Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Fajardo

Plaintiff: Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Apprenticeship Training Fund, Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, East Bay/ North Bay Roofers Vacation Trust Fund, Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Promotion Fund, Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund and Doug Ziegler
Defendant: George L. Fajardo
Case Number: 3:2013cv01519
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 8 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Motion for default judgment due by 8/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/01/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
September 3, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 11/6/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/3/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
October 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND ORDERING Plaintiff to resubmit declaration supporting request for attorneys fees re 13 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/4/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 29, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONTINGENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL RE 21 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/29/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Fajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Apprenticeship Training Fund
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay/ North Bay Roofers Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Counties Roofing Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Ziegler
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Fajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.