McBride et al v. Mylan, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael McBride, Pedro Garcia, Kenny Spencer, Mario Valdez and Robert Ryan
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01533
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PENDING MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/28/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
July 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
September 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
January 17, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/6/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/3/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
May 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria approving 37 Motion for Preliminary Class Settlement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
October 8, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 43 Motion for Attorney Fees.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 44 Motion for Settlement.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride et al v. Mylan, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McBride
Represented By: Samantha W. Zutler
Represented By: Geoffrey Spellberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Garcia
Represented By: Samantha W. Zutler
Represented By: Geoffrey Spellberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Spencer
Represented By: Samantha W. Zutler
Represented By: Geoffrey Spellberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Valdez
Represented By: Samantha W. Zutler
Represented By: Geoffrey Spellberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ryan
Represented By: Samantha W. Zutler
Represented By: Geoffrey Spellberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Eisen
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Represented By: Jennifer P. Svanfeldt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]