Cadence Design Systems Inc v. Berkeley Design Automation Inc

Defendant: Berkeley Design Automation Inc
Plaintiff: Cadence Design Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv01539
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for June 4, 2013 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
October 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 11/15/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 11/15/2013 is CONTINUED to Friday, 12/6/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
December 20, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING MOTION AS WITHDRAWN; SETTING COMPLIANCE DATE. Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkeley Design Automation Inc. Compliance Hearing 1/17/2014 at 9:01am.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/20/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 22, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 37 Stipulation filed by Cadence Design Systems Inc, ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/22/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadence Design Systems Inc v. Berkeley Design Automation Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Design Automation Inc
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadence Design Systems Inc
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]