Mendoza v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated et al

Defendant: HealthAllies, Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and MD247.Com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Suzan Mendoza
Case Number: 3:2013cv01553
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton terminating 7 Motion to Certify Class; denying 11 Stipulation (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
November 6, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 44 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by MD247.Com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
January 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 50 Motion to Stay (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthAllies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD247.Com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzan Mendoza
Represented By: Sean P. Reis
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Christopher Dore
Represented By: Stefan Coleman
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]