Haynes v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Paul M. Haynes
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Andrew Guillory, Lenida Reyes and Stephen Yeung
Case Number: 3:2013cv01567
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
January 9, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/9/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
March 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
July 30, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN WRONG CASE*** NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS REPORT ORDER re 45 ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
December 16, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
January 5, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 72 Motion for Reconsideration (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
March 13, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/9/2015 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2015.ORDER GRANTING 77 MOTION Reopen Discovery filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/13/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 27, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/27/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Haynes
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenida Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.