Alcarmen et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank et al

Defendant: Washington Mutual Loan Trust 2006-HE3, Long Beach Securities Corp, Long Beach Mortgage Company, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Joel P. Alcarmen and Alma S. Valdez
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01575
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROVIDING NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEDURE; STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION; GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED OPPOSITION; CONTINUING BRIEFING DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Court STRIKES Plaintiffs' Opposition of January 2, 2014. Plaintiffs amended Opposition filed by 2/14/2014. Defendants Replies to amended Opposition due by 2/21/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2014 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 3/4/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
February 21, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CONTINUED INTENT TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 3/3/2014. Replies due by 3/10/2014. The March 4, 2014 hearing date is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonalez Rogers on 2/21/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
July 8, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
April 16, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alcarmen et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Loan Trust 2006-HE3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Securities Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Mortgage Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: John Charles Hedger
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Mostajelean
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: John Charles Hedger
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Mostajelean
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel P. Alcarmen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma S. Valdez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]