Vargas v. Diaz

Petitioner: Hildebrando Vargas
Respondent: R. M. Diaz
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01584
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
July 3, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 17 Motion for Extension of Time to obtain court forms; granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 9/17/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 19, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vargas v. Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hildebrando Vargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. M. Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]