Mizuho Orthodpedic Systems Inc v. Maquet Cardiovascular, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Mizuho Orthodpedic Systems Inc
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular, L.L.C., Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC and Maquet, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01587
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 SECOND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants will respond to plaintiff's complaint no later than September 9, 2013. The September 20, 2013 case management conference is continued to October 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 8, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
September 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
April 7, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2; ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
May 12, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mizuho Orthodpedic Systems Inc v. Maquet Cardiovascular, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mizuho Orthodpedic Systems Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Thoeming
Represented By: Theodore J. Bielen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]