Asian Law Caucus v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: Asian Law Caucus
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2013cv01593
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2013 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/23/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
August 30, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motions due by 12/10/2013; Responses /Cross Motions due by 1/7/2014. Replies due by 1/21/2014; Replies due by 1/28/2014; Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2014 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
November 20, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 29 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
February 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 31 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 26, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 33 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2014; Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/26/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
September 11, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 37 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
January 5, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015; Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2015 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/5/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
April 6, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/6/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asian Law Caucus v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Jessica Devlin Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.