Patel v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp, U.S. Bank, N.A., Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Plaintiff: Chetann Patel and Harshika Patel
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01625
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 5 Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
June 14, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 14 Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Leave to Amend; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend filed no later than 7/8/13. The Court VACATES the hearing set for June 18, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 25, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 18 Second Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
July 9, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 37 Plaintiffs'(Third)Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and for Preliminary Injunction. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 21, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/21/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
November 5, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 34 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Dismissing Case. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patel v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle McKnight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chetann Patel
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harshika Patel
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]