Mogel v. Hanni

Plaintiff: Mark S. Mogel
Defendant: Kathleen (Kate) Hanni
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01646
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
January 10, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 34 Motion for Leave to File.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
June 26, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to a Magistrate Judge to conduct a settlement if possible within 90 days. Jury Selection set for 6/29/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 6/30/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/2/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/26/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mogel v. Hanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Mogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen (Kate) Hanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]