Azari et al v. Solano County Treasurer Tax Collector et al

Plaintiff: Kaveh Azari, Pari Azari and Kamal Azari
Defendant: Solano County Treasurer Tax Collector and Solano County, California
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01650
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/13/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
July 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 7/25/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/8/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
August 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Azari et al v. Solano County Treasurer Tax Collector et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaveh Azari
Represented By: Robert L. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pari Azari
Represented By: Robert L. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamal Azari
Represented By: Robert L. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Treasurer Tax Collector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]