AH4R-CA, LLC v. De Leon et al

Plaintiff: AH4R-CA, LLC
Defendant: Josefina Lampa De Leon and Arturo De Leon
Case Number: 3:2013cv01667
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGMEENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
August 6, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/8/2013 09:00 AM.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/06/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
September 12, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAIND re: 13 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court. Because there is no basis for the Court to exercise subject matter jurisdiction over the case, the Motion to Remand is GRANTED and the case shall be returned to the Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AH4R-CA, LLC v. De Leon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AH4R-CA, LLC
Represented By: Angie Lam
Represented By: Justin Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefina Lampa De Leon
Represented By: Linda Z. Voss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo De Leon
Represented By: Linda Z. Voss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]