Green et al v. Betz

Plaintiff: Jennivie Green Guardian ad litem for C.G., Marcellus Green and Jennivie Green
Defendant: R. Betz and Does 1 - 10
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01671
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 20, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 24, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING JENNIVIE GREEN'S AND C.G.'S CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DISMISSING MARCELLUS GREEN'S STATE LAW CAUSES OF ACTION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 30, 2013 23 Featured Case PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/27/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 25, 2013 26 Featured Case STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
February 19, 2014 30 Featured Case STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLIANCE DATE; ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green et al v. Betz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennivie Green Guardian ad litem for C.G.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus Green
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennivie Green
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Betz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]