Arnett v. Seaside Transportation Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jackie Arnett
Defendant: Seaside Transportation Services, LLC and Whitney Equipment LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01672
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 100 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
May 2, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
August 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
October 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Plaintiff shall file Second Amended Complaint within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 28, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/28/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
November 26, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND ANY CROSS-CLAIM, COUNTER-CLAIM, OR THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
January 13, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss. ZPMCs motion is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint shall be filed within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
March 5, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to 61 Notice of Change in Counsel. Attorneys Roseanna M Castillo, Michele Cherie Barnes, and Kevin Kenneth Ross added. Attorneys Forrest Booth and Pamela L Schultz terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 19, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request for Dismissal of Cross-Claim against Whitney Equipment, LLC. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
April 1, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/01/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
October 10, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 79 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Seaside Transportation Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/10/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
November 12, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- King.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
December 29, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 90 Discovery Letter Brief.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
February 6, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 95 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnett v. Seaside Transportation Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Arnett
Represented By: Hillary Rose Allyn
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaside Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Keith Randall Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Equipment LLC
Represented By: Keith Randall Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.