Zuniga v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Zuniga
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01678
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION for extension of time for Plaintiff to file Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. SJ Motions due by 3/3/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
July 7, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ganting 29 STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to motion for summary judgment filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Reset Deadlines as to 27 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 8/6/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
September 4, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to motion for remand filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Reset Deadlines as to 27 MOTION to Remand , 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to motion for remand. Responses due by 9/12/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zuniga v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Zuniga
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]