Kaviani-Nejad v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al

Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Citi Mortgage, inc.
Plaintiff: Massoumeh Kaviani-Nejad
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01697
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMSS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.Opposition is due by 6/21/2013. Reply due by 6/27/2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 27, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 8/16/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/27/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 28, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation, filed by Citi Mortgage, inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Massoumeh Kaviani-Nejad. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/28/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
July 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation filed by Citi Mortgage, inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Massoumeh Kaviani-Nejad, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kaviani-Nejad v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jason W. Short
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Christopher Lee Peterson
Represented By: Jillian Allyn Benbow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Mortgage, inc.
Represented By: Jillian Allyn Benbow
Represented By: Jason W. Short
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massoumeh Kaviani-Nejad
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Ito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]