IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. v. 8x8, Inc.

Plaintiff: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: 8x8, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01707
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 104 Proposed Order: Motions due by 10/24/2014; Responses due by 11/7/2014; Replies due by 11/14/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/14/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
July 8, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/7/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
September 9, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 112 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
July 5, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Dates For Meet And Confer And To File Rule 26(f) Report filed by 8x8, Inc., IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/16/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
August 15, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Pierre R. Yanney. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 21, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge re 71 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/21/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
September 5, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Denying 77 Motion to Relate Case. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
November 12, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Terminating 83 Motion for More Definite Statement) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
December 19, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 71 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
January 27, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Set Deadlines as to 73 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 2/11/2014. Replies due by 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. v. 8x8, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Pierre R. Yanney
Represented By: Daniel Adam Rozansky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8x8, Inc.
Represented By: Norma N. Bennett
Represented By: Robert J. Crawford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]