Lampa-De Leon et al v. Deutsche Bank, NTC

Plaintiff: Josefina Lampa-De Leon and Arturo Lampa-De Leon
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, NTC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01709
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Excecutive Committee on 9/27/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/19/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
October 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
August 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) CONTINUING CMC AND (2) TO SHOW CAUSE. The court CONTINUES the case management conference from Thursday, August 22, 2013, to Thursday, September 19, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Ave nue, San Francisco, California. Furthermore, the court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for their failure to prosecute it. Plaintiffs shall do so by filing a written explanation no later than September 6, 2013. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/20/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lampa-De Leon et al v. Deutsche Bank, NTC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Lampa-De Leon
Represented By: Linda Z. Voss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Lampa-De Leon
Represented By: Linda Z. Voss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, NTC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]