Potter Voice Technologies LLC, v. Apple, Inc., et al., Featured Case

Defendant: Apple, Inc
Plaintiff: Potter Voice Technologies LLC,
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01710
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 391 Order granting 389 Motion to Stay entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. However, the trial date will remain on calendar for the time being. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 30, 2014 390 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , Joint Amended filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 389 Second Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. Responses due by 5/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2014 388 Order granting 387 Motion to Stay entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 18, 2014 387 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin George Damstedt for Apple Inc. (Damstedt, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 385 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 384 Motion for Pro Hac Vice James McDonough. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 384 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James McDonough ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8298876.) filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McDonough, James) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 383 Order granting 382 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 14, 2014 382 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Davis ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8292972.) filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Timothy) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Whitefield Ritcheson (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 9, 2014 380 Order granting 378 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 9, 2014 379 Order granting 377 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 8, 2014 378 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline Burt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8279661.) filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 377 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Dara Jeffries ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8278480.) filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jeffries, Dara) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 6, 2014 376 NOTICE by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Notice of Change of Counsel's Name and Contact Information (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 375 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLE INC.S 175 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 20, 2013 ***See text order, document #374. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Replies due by 8/21/2014. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 ***See text order, document #374. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 8/7/2014. Replies due by 8/14/2014. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 374 Order granting 373 Motion to modify schedule entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 17, 2013 373 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE re 362 , 367 filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. Responses due by 12/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2013) Modified on 12/18/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2013 372 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Gardner, Eamonn) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 30, 2013 371 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 369 Stipulated Protective Oder Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 30, 2013 370 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 368 Stipulated E-Discovery Order (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 29, 2013 369 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed) Protective Oder Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials filed by Apple, Inc, Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 368 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint (Proposed) E-Discovery Order filed by Apple, Inc, Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 24, 2013 367 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 366 Motion to Modify Case Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 22, 2013 366 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Schedule re 362 filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2013 365 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2013. (Related documents(s) 363 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 3, 2013 364 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jennifer C. Lu (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 23, 2013 363 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 21, 2013 362 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2013 before Claudia Wilken. Case referred to Private ADR. Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2013; Motions due by 7/31/2014; Responses/Cross Motions due by 8/14/2014; Replies due by 8/21/2014; Replies due by 8/28/2014; Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2014; Further Case Management Conference / Claims Construction /Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (5 day) set for 1/5/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/21/2013. FTR: 2:02-2:20. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 361 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/14/2013) Modified on 8/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2013 360 Order granting 356 Stipulation selecting Private ADR entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 1, 2013 359 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 358 Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/31/2013) Modified on 8/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2013 357 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Apple Inc. and counsel (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 356 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Apple, Inc, Potter Voice Technologies LLC, filed by Apple, Inc, Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 30, 2013 355 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Potter Voice Technologies LLC and Counsel (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 16, 2013 354 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, August 7, 2013, is continued to Wednesday, August 21, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by August 14, 2013. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 5, 2013 353 NOTICE by Potter Voice Technologies LLC, Certificate of Service of Dkt. 352 (Lu, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 2, 2013 352 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 1, 2013 351 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/1/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 350 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 349 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 348 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc.. (Teter, Timothy) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 19, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the case management conference scheduled for July 25, 2013 is continued to August 1, 2013 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 6, 2013 347 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 345 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 346 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 344 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 345 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7747212.) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gardner, Eamonn) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
April 25, 2013 344 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7654396.) filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Leary, Matthew) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 18, 2013 343 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/16/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 342 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:12-cv-01096. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2013: # 2 Transmittal Notice) (gaS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2013 341 MEMORANDUM regarding 339 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 271 Amended Complaint,, filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/13. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
April 12, 2013 340 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, by Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc..(Sander, Michael)
April 12, 2013 339 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 271 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Johnson, Matthew)
April 12, 2013 338 HTC America, Inc.'s ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by HTC America, Inc.,.(Featherstone, Bruce)
April 12, 2013 337 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Saffer, Ian)
April 12, 2013 336 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, by Google, Inc.,.(Saffer, Ian)
April 5, 2013 335 MINUTE ENTRY for Markman proceedings held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/5/2013. Court addresses the Joint Proposed Agenda for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing 331 . It is ordered Apple, Inc., is DROPPED as a named party to this action; the caption is amended accordingly, effective forthwith; plaintiff's oral motion to strike Dr. Weems' testimony is respectfully DENIED. Hearing concluded. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (kfinn, )
April 4, 2013 334 MINUTE ORDER. 331 Joint Proposed Agenda for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing is approved. The afternoon portion of the hearing shall begin at 1:30 p.m. rather than 1:00 p.m., as proposed by the parties. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/13. (kfinn, )
April 4, 2013 333 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Kinton on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Kinton, John)
April 3, 2013 332 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tharan Gregory Lanier on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Lanier, Tharan)
April 3, 2013 331 NOTICE of Joint Proposed Agenda for Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing by Defendants Google, Inc.,, HTC America, Inc.,, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,, Microsoft Corporation,, Motorola Mobility LLC, Nokia, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc.,, Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Electronics Corporation,, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Williams, Elizabeth Danielle)
April 3, 2013 330 NOTICE of Glossary Terms for Markman Hearing by Defendants Apple, Inc.,, Google, Inc.,, HTC America, Inc.,, Huawei America, Inc.,, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.,, Kyocera Corporation,, Kyocera International, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,, LG Electronics, Inc.,, Microsoft Corporation,, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Solutions, Inc.,, Nokia Corporation,, Nokia, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc.,, Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Corporation,, Sharp Electronics Corporation,, Sony Corporation of America,, Sony Corporation,, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB,, ZTE (USA) Inc.,, ZTE Corporation, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saffer, Ian)
April 3, 2013 329 STATEMENT re 327 Minute Order Glossary for the April 5, 2013 Claim Constuction Hearing by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Lin, Richard)
April 1, 2013 328 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Chia-Ying Lu on behalf of Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Lu, Jennifer)
April 1, 2013 327 MINUTE ORDER. On or before 12:00 p.m. (MDT), April 3, 2013, the parties shall file their glossaries for the Markman hearing set Friday, April 5, 2013. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 326 Featured Case ORDER. The claims of the plaintiff against defendants, Google, Inc, HTC America, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., and Microsoft Corporation, ARE COMBINED FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE of the Markman hearing scheduled for Friday, April 5, 2013. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 325 REPLY to Response to 308 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Defendant HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
March 29, 2013 324 Witness List by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Lin, Richard)
March 29, 2013 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Eric Klein)(Kay, Randall)
March 29, 2013 322 Featured Case ORDER denying 128 Google Inc.'s Motion To Stay Claims. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 321 Featured Case ORDER. HTC America, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 168 is DENIED; Apple Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss 175 is DENIED without prejudice; Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint 181 is DENIED; Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint 182 is DENIED; Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss 183 is DENIED; and ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 184 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 320 Featured Case ORDER granting 180 Motion to Transfer Case. The claims of the plaintiff, Potter Voice Technologies LLC, against defendant, Apple, Inc., as stated in the plaintiff's fourth amended complaint 271 are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 319 Featured Case ORDER. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion To Sever 179 is GRANTED; Microsoft Corporation's Motion To Sever 209 is GRANTED; Google's Motion To Sever 233 is GRANTED; LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc.s Motion to Join Google's Motion to Sever 240 is GRANTED; Kyocera's Motion to Join Google's Motion to Sever 243 is GRANTED; Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.'s Motion to Join Google's Motion to Sever 251 is GRANTED; Huawei Device USA Inc.'s Joinder in Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever 256 is GRANTED; Sharp Electronics Corporation's Motion to Join Google's Motion to Sever 258 is GRANTED; HTC America, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 168 is GRANTED, but only insofar as it requests severance; ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 184 is GRANTED, but only insofar as it requests severance; the claims of plaintiff, Potter Voice Technologies LLC, against defendants, Apple, Inc., Google, Inc, HTC America, Inc. Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., and Microsoft Corporation, are SEVERED; the plaintiff's claims against each such defendant SHALL BE TRIED separately; HTC America, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 168 is DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal based on improper joinder; and ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint 184 is DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal based on improper joinder. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/13. (kfinn, )
March 29, 2013 318 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William H. Boice on behalf of Google, Inc.,, Motorola Mobility LLC (Boice, William)
March 29, 2013 317 Witness List for Defendants filed by by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Saffer, Ian)
March 27, 2013 316 REPLY to Response to 309 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Klausner filed by Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation,, Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Kinsel, Grant)
March 22, 2013 315 BRIEF in Opposition to 309 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Klausner filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Richard C. Lin)(Lin, Richard)
March 22, 2013 314 BRIEF in Opposition to 308 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin)(Lin, Richard)
March 8, 2013 313 MINUTE ORDER granting 311 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Dominic Eugene Massa; Srecko Vidmar; Craig Evan Davis and Clayton Cole James terminated. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/13. (kfinn, )
March 7, 2013 312 MEMORANDUM regarding 311 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/7/13. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
March 7, 2013 311 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,. (Davis, Craig)
March 5, 2013 310 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Christopher David Banys (Banys, Christopher)
March 1, 2013 309 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David Klausner by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kinsel, Grant)
March 1, 2013 308 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 112 by Defendant HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
February 27, 2013 307 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott F. Llewellyn on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (Llewellyn, Scott)
February 25, 2013 306 Featured Case ORDER granting 302 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James William Soong is terminated as counsel of record for Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate electronic notification to Mr. Soong and to remove him from the Notice of Electronic Filing. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/25/13. (cbssec)
February 15, 2013 305 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martin Murray Noonen on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (Noonen, Martin)
February 15, 2013 304 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vincent Joseph Belusko on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (Belusko, Vincent)
February 15, 2013 303 MEMORANDUM regarding 302 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for James W. Soong filed by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/15/13. Text Only Entry (rebcd)
February 15, 2013 302 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for James W. Soong by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Kramer, Amy)
December 7, 2012 301 Featured Case ORDER granting 292 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Jose L. Patino and Nicola Anthony Pisano are terminated as counsel of record for Kyocera International, Inc. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate their electronic notification and to remove them from the Notice of Electronic Filing. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/7/12.(cbssec)
December 7, 2012 300 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 283 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 299 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited's Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 284 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 298 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 282 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 297 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 277 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 296 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 279 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 295 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's Answer to Kyocera International, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 276 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 294 MINUTE ORDER re telephonic setting conference. IT IS ORDERED that on 4/5/2013, commencing at 9:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a Markman hearing in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/2012. (klyon, )
December 7, 2012 293 MEMORANDUM regarding 292 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kyocera International, Inc. for Jose L. Patino and Nicola Anthony Pisano filed by Kyocera International, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/7/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
December 6, 2012 292 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kyocera International, Inc. for Jose L. Patino and Nicola Anthony Pisano by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kay, Randall)
December 6, 2012 291 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jose L. Patino and Nicola Anthony Pisano as Counsel for Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Kay, Randall)
December 6, 2012 290 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Randall Evan Kay on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Kay, Randall)
December 5, 2012 289 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information For Counsel Representing Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. by Jose L. Patino (Patino, Jose)
December 4, 2012 288 Potter Voice Technologies, LLC's ANSWER/REPLY to 275 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Apple Inc. by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Banys, Christopher)
November 30, 2012 287 REPLY to 269 Brief,, Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies, LLC'S Reply Brief Regarding Claim Construction by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Richard C. Lin)(Lin, Richard)
November 26, 2012 286 ERRATA re 285 Response, [285-1] Declaration of Charles Weems by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Weems Declaration)(Merrill, Kourtney)
November 20, 2012 285 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Weems Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Weems CV, # 3 Exhibit Weems Book Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit Sanders Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Klausner Transcript Pages, # 6 Exhibit OA Response, # 7 Exhibit Notice of Allowability, # 8 Exhibit 659 Patent)(Saffer, Ian)
November 19, 2012 284 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Research In Motion Limited,, Research In Motion Corporation,.(Davis, Craig)
November 19, 2012 283 Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, (Fourth), Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.(Polk, Victor)
November 19, 2012 282 Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Pantech Wireless, Inc.,.(Hanlon-Leh, Natalie)
November 19, 2012 281 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, by Sharp Electronics Corporation,.(Devkar, Andrew)
November 19, 2012 280 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, by Nokia, Inc.,.(Bialecki, Scott)
November 19, 2012 279 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Huawei Device USA, Inc..(Bartel, Trevor)
November 19, 2012 278 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Fourth by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,.(Rocchegiani, Renzo)
November 19, 2012 277 Defendant Microscoft's ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Microsoft Corporation,.(Kinsel, Grant)
November 19, 2012 276 ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, Fourth, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Kyocera International, Inc..(Patino, Jose)
November 13, 2012 275 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 271 Amended Complaint,, (Fourth Amended) and, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Apple, Inc.,.(Teter, Timothy)
November 8, 2012 274 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erik James Dykema on behalf of Nokia Corporation,, Nokia, Inc., (Dykema, Erik)
November 7, 2012 273 MINUTE ORDER granting 272 Motion for Leave. Defendants are granted up to 20 pages of substantive briefing (the same number of pages of substantive briefing as Potter Voice's Brief) to present their responsive claim construction arguments, excluding the cover page, tables of contents and authorities, signature blocks, and certificate of service. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/7/12. Text Only Entry(rebsec, )
November 7, 2012 272 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Claim Construction Brief of 20 Pages of Substantive Content by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,. (Vidmar, Srecko)
November 5, 2012 271 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND against Apple, Inc., Google, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Nokia, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (kfinn, )
November 5, 2012 270 Featured Case ORDER granting 264 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (doc. #264-2) and Exhibit A (doc. #264-3) are accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/5/12. (cbssec)
October 30, 2012 269 BRIEF Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies, LLC'S Opening Claim Construction Brief by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Klausner, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David Klausner, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David Klausner, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David Klausner, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of David Klausner, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Richard C. Lin)(Banys, Christopher)
October 29, 2012 268 Featured Case ORDER approving 266 Stipulation By Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC and Certain Defendants Regarding Pending Motions. See attached order for further information. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/12. (kfinn, )
October 26, 2012 267 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 09/14/2012 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-62. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
October 25, 2012 266 STIPULATION by Plaintiff Potter Voice and Certain Defendants Regarding Pending Motions by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saffer, Ian)
October 25, 2012 265 MEMORANDUM regarding 264 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/25/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
October 24, 2012 264 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), # 2 Proposed Document, # 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Document)(Lin, Richard)
October 24, 2012 263 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Richard C. Lin by Richard Cheng-Hong Lin on behalf of Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Lin, Richard)
October 23, 2012 262 STATEMENT Plaintiff and Defendants' Joint Claim Construction Statement and Statement of Intended Impact by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Banys, Christopher)
October 22, 2012 261 BRIEF in Support of 233 MOTION to Sever filed by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Saffer, Ian)
October 19, 2012 260 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Todd Snyder on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Snyder, Steven)
October 19, 2012 259 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexas D. Skucas on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Skucas, Alexas)
October 18, 2012 258 MOTION for Joinder re 233 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation,. (Park, Patrick)
October 17, 2012 257 NOTICE re 256 Joinder Exhibit 1 to Joinder re 233 Motion to Sever by Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Bartel, Trevor)
October 16, 2012 256 JOINDER re 233 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Bartel, Trevor)
October 16, 2012 255 Featured Case ORDER granting 253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Yang is terminated as counsel of record for ZTE (USA) Inc. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate electronic notification to Ms. Yang and to remove her from the Notice of Electronic Filing. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/16/12. (cbssec)
October 16, 2012 254 MEMORANDUM regarding 253 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Elizabeth Yang filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.,. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/16/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
October 15, 2012 253 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Elizabeth Yang by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Yang, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2012 252 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Elizabeth Yang, Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz LLP as counsel for Defendant ZTE (USA) INC. by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc., (Yang, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/11/2012. Email request to refile has been made (kfinn, ).
October 9, 2012 251 MOTION to Sever by Joining Google's Motion by Defendant Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Smith, J.)
October 9, 2012 250 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Scott Robertson Miller (Miller, Scott)
October 8, 2012 249 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Stephan Mancuso on behalf of Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Mancuso, Nicholas)
October 5, 2012 248 BRIEF in Opposition to 233 MOTION to Sever filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Banys, Christopher)
October 1, 2012 247 BRIEF in Support of 209 Renewed MOTION to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 299 filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,, Counter Claimant Microsoft Corporation,. (Kinsel, Grant)
September 25, 2012 246 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 244 Motion to Substitute Party. Upon the filing of Plaintiff's 165 Third Amended Complaint on July 24, 2012, Defendant Motorola Mobility, LLC was listed as a Defendant in place of Motorola Mobility, Inc. and the clerk's office modified the docket sheet accordingly. Counsel are directed to take note of this change and revise their case files as well. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/25/12.(cbssec)
September 24, 2012 245 MEMORANDUM regarding 244 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/24/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
September 24, 2012 244 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saffer, Ian)
September 21, 2012 243 MOTION for Joinder re 233 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. (Patino, Jose)
September 21, 2012 242 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicola Anthony Pisano on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Pisano, Nicola)
September 21, 2012 241 REPLY to Response to 183 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Smith, J.)
September 18, 2012 240 MOTION for Joinder re 233 MOTION to Sever by Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,. (Wick Mulvany, Sandra)
September 17, 2012 238 REPLY to Response to 184 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint) (Reply in Support) filed by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Johnson, Matthew)
September 17, 2012 237 REPLY to Response to 180 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Teter, Timothy)
September 17, 2012 236 REPLY to Response to 179 MOTION to Sever filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Teter, Timothy)
September 17, 2012 235 REPLY to Response to 182 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC. (Saffer, Ian)
September 17, 2012 234 REPLY to Response to 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Saffer, Ian)
September 14, 2012 239 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 9/14/2012. The court shall require the production of Google Voice Search materials no later than September 28, 2012. An additional 30 days shall be given to produce materials on the other product (Google Voice Actions). FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
September 14, 2012 233 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
September 14, 2012 232 REPLY to Response to 168 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
September 14, 2012 231 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 07/24/2012 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-44. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
September 14, 2012 230 REPLY to Response to 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Teter, Timothy)
September 14, 2012 229 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing on 9/14/2012 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/14/12. (cbssec)
September 13, 2012 228 BRIEF in Opposition to 209 Renewed MOTION to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 299 filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Bedell, Daniel)
September 11, 2012 227 MINUTE ORDER granting 226 Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss. Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc. shall have until September 21, 2012, in which to file its reply. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/12.(mjgsl, )
September 11, 2012 226 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 183 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Smith, J.)
September 7, 2012 225 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Notice of Change of Address and Affiliation by Scott Robert Bialecki (Bialecki, Scott)
August 31, 2012 224 BRIEF in Opposition to 183 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Daniel W. Bedell, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Bedell, Daniel)
August 31, 2012 223 BRIEF in Opposition to 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 31, 2012 222 BRIEF in Opposition to 182 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 31, 2012 221 BRIEF in Opposition to 184 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint) filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 29, 2012 220 BRIEF in Opposition to 180 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 29, 2012 219 BRIEF in Opposition to 179 MOTION to Sever filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel W. Bedell, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Daniel W. Bedell)(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 218 BRIEF in Opposition to 168 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 217 BRIEF in Opposition to 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 216 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 176 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 215 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Huawei Device USA Inc.'s Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 167 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 214 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Kyocera International, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 213 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 169 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 212 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 172 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 211 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Research in Motion Corporation and Research in Motion Limited's Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 171 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 28, 2012 210 Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Answer to Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER/REPLY to 173 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
August 23, 2012 209 Renewed MOTION to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 299 by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kinsel, Grant)
August 21, 2012 208 Featured Case ORDER denying 101 Motion to Stay and 123 Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Given the current posture of the case these motions are denied. Parties have leave to refile should circumstances change. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/21/12.(cbssec)
August 21, 2012 207 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/21/12. ORDERED that parties MUST fully comply with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2, specifically those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal. (cbssec)
August 21, 2012 206 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 202 Motion for Protective Order and finding as moot 187 Motion for Protective Order and 193 Motion for Protective Order. ORDERED that the Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/21/12 is VACATED. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/21/12. (cbssec)
August 21, 2012 205 Featured Case STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PHASE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/21/12. (cbssec)
August 21, 2012 204 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH CM/ECF PROCEDURES: Elliot Charles Cook has failed to register for electronic case filing in violation of local rules and procedures of the court. Counsel is advised that the failure to register for CM/ECF within 10 days of the date of this docket entry may lead to sanctions by the court. Counsel can register at https://www.cod.uscourts.gov/cmecf/cm_actreg.aspx. Text Only Entry (mjfsl, )
August 21, 2012 203 MEMORANDUM regarding 202 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Research In Motion Limited,, Research In Motion Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
August 20, 2012 202 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vidmar, Srecko)
August 20, 2012 201 Proposed Scheduling Order [Joint] Regarding Claim Construction Phase by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Banys, Christopher)
August 20, 2012 200 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER converting the 8/21/2012 Status Conference to a Telephonic Status Conference at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/20/12. (cbssec)
August 17, 2012 199 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2012. A Rule 26(f) Conference is set for 8/21/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The court advises the parties that the proposed protective order, the e-discovery protocol, and any agreements regarding claims construction discovery should all be updated and ready for the 26(f) conference. The parties appearing by telephone shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
August 16, 2012 198 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 189 Motion for Protective Order in light Defendants' filing an Amended 193 Motion for Protective Order. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/16/12.(cbssec)
August 16, 2012 197 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Douglas B. Tumminello by Douglas B. Tumminello on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Tumminello, Douglas)
August 15, 2012 196 NOTICE re 193 Amended MOTION for Protective Order , 189 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Joinder and Objection In Part to Defendants' Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Patino, Jose)
August 15, 2012 195 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 185 Joint Motion To Amend Order For Briefing on Markman Issues. The court's Order For Briefing on Markman Issues 74 entered June 18, 2012, is AMENDED as set forth in the attached minute order. The court's Order For Briefing on Markman Issues 74 entered June 18, 2012, is amended accordingly to the limited extent necessary to facilitate and implement this order. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/15/12.(mjgsl, )
August 15, 2012 194 MEMORANDUM regarding 193 Amended MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., Apple, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., HTC America, Inc., Nokia, Inc., Google, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/15/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
August 15, 2012 193 Amended MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Apple, Inc.,, Google, Inc.,, HTC America, Inc.,, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,, Microsoft Corporation,, Motorola Mobility LLC, Nokia, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Electronics Corporation,, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Teter, Timothy)
August 15, 2012 192 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Courtney Anne Levkulich on behalf of HTC America, Inc., (Levkulich, Courtney)
August 15, 2012 191 Proposed Scheduling Order [Joint] by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 15, 2012 190 MEMORANDUM regarding 187 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation, 189 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sharp Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, ZTE Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei America, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., Nokia, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Electronics Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.,. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/15/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
August 15, 2012 189 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Apple, Inc.,, HTC America, Inc.,, Huawei America, Inc.,, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,, LG Electronics, Inc.,, Microsoft Corporation,, Nokia Corporation,, Nokia, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Corporation,, Sharp Electronics Corporation,, ZTE (USA) Inc.,, ZTE Corporation,, Garnishee HTC Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Teter, Timothy)
August 14, 2012 188 NOTICE of Joint Proposed E-Discovery Order by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Bedell, Daniel)
August 14, 2012 187 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Proposed Protective Order))(Vidmar, Srecko)
August 14, 2012 186 Proposed Scheduling Order [Joint] by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
August 14, 2012 185 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 74 Order by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saffer, Ian)
August 10, 2012 184 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint) by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Johnson, Matthew)
August 10, 2012 183 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US 7,158,934, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - US 7,249,017, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Smith, J.)
August 10, 2012 182 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint by Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC. (Saffer, Ian)
August 10, 2012 181 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Inducement of Infringement in the Third Amended Complaint by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Saffer, Ian)
August 8, 2012 180 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Buckley, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 5 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 6 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner)(Teter, Timothy)
August 8, 2012 179 MOTION to Sever by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Buckley, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner, # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Eammon Gardner)(Teter, Timothy)
August 7, 2012 178 Nokia Inc's ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, by Nokia, Inc.,.(Kelly, Erin)
August 7, 2012 177 Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation's ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, by Sharp Electronics Corporation,.(Devkar, Andrew)
August 7, 2012 176 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Teter, Timothy)
August 7, 2012 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Leary Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Teter, Timothy)
August 7, 2012 174 Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A. Inc.'s ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,.(Rocchegiani, Renzo)
August 7, 2012 173 Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.(Polk, Victor)
August 7, 2012 172 ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Pantech Wireless, Inc.,.(Hanlon-Leh, Natalie)
August 7, 2012 171 ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Research In Motion Limited,, Research In Motion Corporation,.(Davis, Craig)
August 7, 2012 170 Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.'s ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, (Third), COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Kyocera International, Inc..(Patino, Jose)
August 7, 2012 169 ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Microsoft Corporation,.(Kinsel, Grant)
August 7, 2012 168 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Third Amended Complaint by Defendant HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
August 7, 2012 167 Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc.'s ANSWER to 165 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Huawei Device USA, Inc..(Bartel, Trevor)
August 7, 2012 166 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER sua sponte resetting the start time for the scheduling conference due to a conflict on the court's calendar. ORDERED that the 8/17/2012 Scheduling Conference is reset to 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/7/12. (cbssec)
July 27, 2012 163 ANSWER/REPLY to 127 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, (filed by Apple Inc.) by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 162 ANSWER/REPLY to 129 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, (filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc.) by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 161 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - consistent with the court's rulings during the hearing held on 7/24/12 it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed 153 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff's tendered [153-2] Third Amended Complaint is deem filed as of July 24, 2012. FURTHER ORDERED that 10 Motion to Dismiss; 104 Motion to Dismiss; 108 Motion to Dismiss; 114 Motion to Dismiss; 115 Motion to Dismiss; 118 Motion to Dismiss; 120 Motion to Dismiss; 121 Motion to Dismiss; 122 Motion to Dismiss; 124 Motion to Dismiss; 125 Motion to Dismiss; 126 Motion to Dismiss; 132 Motion to Dismiss; 133 Motion to Dismiss; and 134 Motion to Dismiss are hereby MOOT. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/27/12. (cbssec)
July 27, 2012 160 ANSWER/REPLY to 110 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (filed by Microsoft Corporation) by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,.(Bedell, Daniel)
July 24, 2012 165 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND against Apple, Inc., Google, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Nokia, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(wjcsl, ) Modified on 7/31/2012 to correct filed date (wjcsl, ).
July 24, 2012 164 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 7/24/2012. The court GRANTS 153 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed as of July 24, 2012. The court FINDS AS MOOT: 10 Motion to Dismiss; 104 Motion to Dismiss; 108 Motion to Dismiss; 114 Motion to Dismiss; 115 Motion to Dismiss; 118 Motion to Dismiss; 120 Motion to Dismiss; 121 Motion to Dismiss; 122 Motion to Dismiss; 124 Motion to Dismiss; 125 Motion to Dismiss; 126 Motion to Dismiss; 132 Motion to Dismiss; 133 Motion to Dismiss; and 134 Motion to Dismiss. A Scheduling Conference is set for August 17, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and also email an editable version to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov on or before August 14, 2012. The parties shall also be required to submit an e-discovery and any proposed orders of protection on or before August 14, 2012. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
July 23, 2012 159 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dominic Eugene Massa on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (Massa, Dominic)
July 20, 2012 158 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Srecko Vidmar on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (Vidmar, Srecko)
July 20, 2012 157 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clayton Cole James on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited, (James, Clayton)
July 20, 2012 156 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard de Bodo on behalf of Sharp Electronics Corporation, (de Bodo, Richard)
July 20, 2012 155 BRIEF in Opposition to 123 MOTION to Stay , 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims, 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bedell, Daniel)
July 19, 2012 154 MEMORANDUM regarding 153 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/19/12. Text Only Entry (rebcd)
July 19, 2012 153 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), # 2 Proposed Document, # 3 Proposed Document Exhibit A)(Bedell, Daniel)
July 17, 2012 152 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew V. Devkar on behalf of Sharp Electronics Corporation, (Devkar, Andrew)
July 13, 2012 151 Featured Case ORDER terminating 148 Motion for Joinder; terminating 149 Motion for Joinder. Parties can file a joinder by linking it to the motion they seek to join without filing a formal motion. ORDERED that the court accepts as filed Defendant Kyocer's 148 Joinder to 120 Motion to Dismiss and Defendant's Kyocera's 149 Joinder to 123 Motion to Stay. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/13/12.(cbssec)
July 13, 2012 150 MEMORANDUM regarding 149 MOTION for Joinder re 123 MOTION to Stay , 102 Brief in Support of Motion, 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims, 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants filed by Kyocera International, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/13/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
July 12, 2012 149 MOTION for Joinder re 123 MOTION to Stay , 102 Brief in Support of Motion, 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims, 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. (Patino, Jose)
July 12, 2012 148 MOTION for Joinder re 120 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc. for Improper Joinder or Alternatively to Sever, 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder or Alternatively to Sever, 104 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss Claims for Indirect Infringement by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. (Patino, Jose)
July 12, 2012 147 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Google, Inc.,, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Williams, Elizabeth Danielle)
July 11, 2012 146 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - in preparation for the status conference set on July 24, 2012, it is ORDERED that local counsel must physically appear. Out-of-state counsel may participate by telephone and shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/11/12. (cbssec)
July 11, 2012 145 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Yang on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., (Yang, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2012 144 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Hoch Altersohn on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Altersohn, Allison)
July 10, 2012 143 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Arthur Wright on behalf of Pantech Wireless, Inc., (Wright, Alan)
July 9, 2012 142 JOINDER re 123 MOTION to Stay , 102 Brief in Support of Motion, 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims, 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants on behalf of Defendants HTC America, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., and Nokia Inc. by Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,. (Wick Mulvany, Sandra)
July 9, 2012 141 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER converting the scheduling conference to a status conference on 7/24/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties are not required to comply with the deadlines set forth in the court's 44 Order resetting hearing. ORDERED that on or before 7/20/12, Plaintiff shall file a consolidated response to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s 123 MOTION to Stay; Google, Inc.'s 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims; and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants. No reply briefs will be permitted except with leave of the court. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/9/12. (cbssec)
July 9, 2012 140 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Saffer, Ian)
July 9, 2012 139 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 117 Motion to Stay in light of Defendant Google, Inc. filing an 128 Amended Motion to Stay Claims. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/9/12. (cbssec)
July 9, 2012 138 MEMORANDUM regarding 117 MOTION to Stay Claims filed by Google, Inc., Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
July 9, 2012 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hanlon-Leh, Natalie)
July 9, 2012 136 MEMORANDUM regarding 123 MOTION to Stay filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
July 6, 2012 135 ANSWER to 83 Amended Complaint by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,.(Wick Mulvany, Sandra)
July 6, 2012 134 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Join Motions to Dismiss for Improper Joinder and Claims for Indirect Infringement by Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,. (Wick Mulvany, Sandra)
July 6, 2012 133 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Indirect Infringement in Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Nokia, Inc.,. (Perry, Robert)
July 6, 2012 132 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder or Alternatively to Sever and Motion to Dismiss Claims for Indirect Infringement by Defendant ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Miller, Scott)
July 6, 2012 131 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Robertson Miller on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., (Miller, Scott)
July 6, 2012 130 JOINDER re 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect Infringement Claims and Motion to Strike by Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Bartel, Trevor)
July 6, 2012 129 Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc.'s ANSWER to 83 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Potter Voice Technologies LLC, by Huawei Device USA, Inc..(Bartel, Trevor)
July 6, 2012 128 Amended MOTION to Stay Claims by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 127 ANSWER to 83 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Potter Voice Technologies, LLC, by Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Teter, Timothy) Modified on 7/9/2012 to correct text to reflect "Potter Voice Technologies, LLC,", pursuant to request from counsel for Apple, Inc. on 7/9/12 (mjgsl, ).
July 6, 2012 126 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Apple, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Leary Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-D, # 3 Exhibit E-G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Teter, Timothy)
July 6, 2012 125 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Indirect Infringement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Strong, Gayle)
July 6, 2012 124 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect Infringement Claims by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 123 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder or Alternatively to Sever by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 121 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Join, in Part, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,. (Davis, Craig)
July 6, 2012 120 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc. for Improper Joinder or Alternatively to Sever by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Davis, Craig)
July 6, 2012 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect Infringement Claims and Motion to Strike by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 117 MOTION to Stay Claims by Defendant Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Saffer, Ian)
July 6, 2012 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ZTE Corporation for ZTE (USA) Inc.,. (Gottschalk, Hugh)
July 6, 2012 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims of Indirect Infringement in Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc.,. (Hanlon-Leh, Natalie)
July 6, 2012 114 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect Infringement Claims by Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation,. (Park, Patrick)
July 6, 2012 113 MEMORANDUM regarding 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants filed by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/6/12. Text Only Entry (rebcd)
July 6, 2012 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Park, Patrick)
July 6, 2012 111 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jerry R. Selinger on behalf of HTC America, Inc., (Selinger, Jerry)
July 6, 2012 110 Defendant Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to 83 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Microsoft Corporation,.(Kinsel, Grant)
July 6, 2012 109 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh on behalf of Pantech Wireless, Inc., (Hanlon-Leh, Natalie)
July 6, 2012 108 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
July 6, 2012 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America, Inc.,. (Featherstone, Bruce)
July 6, 2012 106 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Carnaval, Christopher)
July 6, 2012 105 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert F. Perry on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Perry, Robert)
July 6, 2012 104 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Pat. No. 7,158,934, # 2 Exhibit US Pat. No. 7,249,017, # 3 Exhibit Sony Buys Ericsson Stake in Handset Joint Venture, Wall St. J. (Oct. 28, 2011), # 4 Exhibit Sony Completes Full Acquisition of Sony Ericsson (Feb. 16, 2012))(Sander, Michael)
July 6, 2012 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sander, Michael)
July 6, 2012 102 BRIEF in Support of 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Polk, Victor)
July 6, 2012 101 MOTION to Stay Action Against the Defendant Handset Defendants by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Polk, Victor)
July 5, 2012 100 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bruce A. Featherstone on behalf of HTC America, Inc., (Featherstone, Bruce)
June 29, 2012 99 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hugh Q. Gottschalk on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., (Gottschalk, Hugh)
June 29, 2012 98 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew E. Johnson on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., (Johnson, Matthew)
June 29, 2012 97 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Anne Kelly on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Kelly, Erin)
June 29, 2012 96 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sandra B. Wick Mulvany on behalf of LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., (Wick Mulvany, Sandra)
June 28, 2012 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc., Corporate Parent LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,. (Rocchegiani, Renzo)
June 28, 2012 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Corporate Parent Nokia Holding Inc., for Nokia, Inc.(Bialecki, Scott) Modified on 6/29/2012 to add corporate parent text (wjcsl, ).
June 28, 2012 93 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Robert Bialecki on behalf of Nokia, Inc., (Bialecki, Scott)
June 27, 2012 92 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick S. Park on behalf of Sharp Electronics Corporation, (Park, Patrick)
June 27, 2012 91 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Aframe Edlin on behalf of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Edlin, Richard)
June 22, 2012 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. ZTE (USA) Inc., served on 6/1/2012, answer due 7/6/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 22, 2012 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Pantech Wireless, Inc., served on 5/31/2012, answer due 7/6/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 22, 2012 88 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Scott Teter on behalf of Apple, Inc., (Teter, Timothy)
June 21, 2012 87 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen C. Neal on behalf of Apple, Inc., (Neal, Stephen)
June 21, 2012 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gardner, Eamonn)
June 21, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., ONLY re: 84 NOTICE of Dismissal of Motorola Solutions, Inc. by Plaintiff is approved. That plaintiff's claims against defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. are DISMISSED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/21/12. (dbrow, )
June 20, 2012 84 NOTICE of Dismissal of Motorola Solutions, Inc. by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Bedell, Daniel)
June 19, 2012 83 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement And Jury Demand, filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC.(mjgsl, )
June 19, 2012 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Corporation for Kyocera International, Inc.. (Patino, Jose)
June 19, 2012 81 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Second Amended by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc.. Kyocera International, Inc. answer due 7/13/2012. (Patino, Jose)
June 19, 2012 80 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/19/12. ORDERED that the Plaintiff's tendered Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand (doc. no. 77-3) is accepted for filing as of the date of this order. The July 6, 2012 deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond remains set. Text Only Entry(cbssec)
June 19, 2012 79 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew James Leary on behalf of Apple, Inc., (Leary, Matthew)
June 19, 2012 78 MEMORANDUM regarding 77 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/19/12. Text Only Entry (rebsec, )
June 18, 2012 77 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Proposed Document)(Bedell, Daniel)
June 18, 2012 76 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Scott M. Browning, Esq. by Scott Mark Browning on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Browning, Scott)
June 18, 2012 75 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eamonn Joseph Gardner on behalf of Apple, Inc., (Gardner, Eamonn)
June 18, 2012 74 Featured Case ORDER For Briefing On Markman Issues. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/12. (mjgsl, )
June 15, 2012 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Huaweii Device (Hong Kong) Co., Limited for Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Bartel, Trevor)
June 15, 2012 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bartel, Trevor)
June 15, 2012 71 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Trevor G. Bartel, Esq. by Trevor G. Bartel on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Bartel, Trevor)
June 15, 2012 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Edwin Palys on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Palys, Joseph)
June 15, 2012 69 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James William Soong on behalf of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Soong, James)
June 15, 2012 68 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani on behalf of LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., (Rocchegiani, Renzo)
June 15, 2012 67 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 66 Order. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-01096-REB-CBS. Text Only Entry (ktera)
June 15, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal File to be returned to the clerks office for random reassignment by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/15/12. (ktera)
June 12, 2012 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Huawei Device USA, Inc. served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 12, 2012 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Nokia, Inc., served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 12, 2012 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Kyocera International, Inc. served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 12, 2012 61 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victor H. Polk, Jr on behalf of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Polk, Victor)
June 12, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER 48 Stipulation re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder is granted. Court will take motion to dismiss under review as a motion to dismiss the later-filed Amended Complaint, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/12/12. (gmssl, )
June 12, 2012 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Saffer, Ian)
June 11, 2012 65 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings regarding amended complaint: Apple, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Google, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; HTC America, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Huawei Device USA, Inc. answer due 7/6/2012; Kyocera International, Inc. answer due 7/6/2012; LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Microsoft Corporation, answer due 7/6/2012; Motorola Mobility, Inc. answer due 7/6/2012; Motorola Solutions, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Nokia, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Pantech Wireless, Inc., answer due 7/6/2012; Research In Motion Corporation, answer due 7/6/2012; Research In Motion Limited, answer due 7/6/2012; Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC answer due 7/6/2012; Sharp Electronics Corporation, answer due 7/6/2012; Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc. answer due 7/6/2012; ZTE (USA) Inc., answer due 7/6/2012. Pursuant to the minute order of 6/11/12 to correct deadlines to link to amended complaint. Text Only Entry (gmssl, )
June 11, 2012 58 REPLY to Response to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Microsoft Corporation for Improper Joinder Under 35 U.S.C. 299 filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Kinsel, Grant)
June 11, 2012 57 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re: deadline to file a responsive pleading as to Plaintiff's 40 Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/11/12. ORDERED that all Defendants shall have up to and including 7/6/12 to answer or otherwise respond. Text Only Entry (cbssec)
June 11, 2012 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Strong, Gayle)
June 8, 2012 55 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Leigh Kramer on behalf of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Kramer, Amy)
June 8, 2012 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gayle Lynn Strong on behalf of Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Strong, Gayle)
June 8, 2012 53 NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Patino, Jose)
June 7, 2012 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jose L. Patino on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Patino, Jose)
June 7, 2012 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Sharp Electronics Corporation, served on 6/7/2012, answer due 6/28/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 7, 2012 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 7, 2012 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 6, 2012 48 STIPULATION re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Microsoft Corporation for Improper Joinder Under 35 U.S.C. 299, 40 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Merrill, Kourtney)
June 5, 2012 47 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant Edward Kinsel on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, (Kinsel, Grant)
June 5, 2012 46 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Mark Smith on behalf of Sony Corporation of America, (Smith, J.)
June 4, 2012 45 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
June 4, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER resetting hearing pursuant to an unopposed telephonic request from counsel by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/4/12. ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference will be held on 7/24/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties shall adhere to the instructions and deadlines previously set forth in the court's 13 Order setting scheduling conference. Text Only Entry (cbssec)
June 4, 2012 43 NOTICE of Dismissal of Sharp Corporation by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Bedell, Daniel)
June 1, 2012 42 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (sahsl, )
May 31, 2012 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Pantech Wireless, Inc., served on 5/15/2012, answer due 7/6/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
May 29, 2012 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand against Apple, Inc.,, Google, Inc.,, HTC America, Inc.,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.,, Microsoft Corporation,, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Solutions, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc.,, Pantech Wireless, Inc.,, Research In Motion Corporation,, Research In Motion Limited,, Sharp Corporation,, Sharp Electronics Corporation,, ZTE (USA) Inc.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.) Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Banys, Christopher)
May 29, 2012 39 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sahsl, )
May 24, 2012 38 BRIEF in Opposition to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Microsoft Corporation for Improper Joinder Under 35 U.S.C. 299 filed by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Banys, Christopher)
May 23, 2012 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. ZTE (USA) Inc., served on 5/7/2012, answer due 7/6/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
May 22, 2012 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Saffer, Ian)
May 22, 2012 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian L. Saffer on behalf of Google, Inc., (Saffer, Ian)
May 18, 2012 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (ervsl, )
May 18, 2012 33 SUMMONS REQUEST as to KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Bedell, Daniel)
May 17, 2012 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., served on 5/2/2012, answer due 7/6/2012. (Bedell, Daniel)
May 17, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. In the interests of judicial efficiency, it is ORDERED that the deadline for ALL Defendants to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 7/6/12. Parties are advised that absent a showing of exceptional good cause, the court is not inclined to extend this deadline again. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon all parties who have not yet entered their appearance. In light of the court sua sponte extending the deadline for all Defendants, counsel are encouraged to file entry of appearances promptly, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/17/12. Text Only Entry(cbssec)
May 16, 2012 30 MEMORANDUM regarding 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Sony Corporation of America,. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/16/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 16, 2012 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Sony Corporation of America,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Popovski, Lewis)
May 16, 2012 28 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Google, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading on or before 7/2/2012, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/16/12. Text Only Entry(cbssec)
May 16, 2012 27 MEMORANDUM regarding 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/16/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 15, 2012 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Defendant Google, Inc. by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bedell, Daniel)
May 15, 2012 24 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
May 14, 2012 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Google, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Apple, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. HTC America, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Microsoft Corporation, served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Motorola Solutions, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Nokia, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Sharp Electronics Corporation, served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Sony Corporation of America, served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 14, 2012 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC,. Research In Motion Corporation, served on 5/1/2012, answer due 5/22/2012. (ervsl, )
May 11, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/25/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/11/12. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Scheduling Order) (cbssec)
May 7, 2012 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Tessar, Amanda)
May 3, 2012 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kourtney Marie Mueller on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, (Mueller, Kourtney)
May 3, 2012 10 MOTION to Dismiss Microsoft Corporation for Improper Joinder Under 35 U.S.C. 299 by Defendant Microsoft Corporation,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tessar, Amanda)
May 1, 2012 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Wayne Bedell on behalf of Potter Voice Technologies LLC, (Bedell, Daniel)
May 1, 2012 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank Brittin Clayton, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Clayton, Frank)
April 26, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Magistrate Judge Shaffer is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/26/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 25, 2012 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Commissioner of Patent (johar, ) Modified on 4/25/2012 to reflect Patent and not Trademark(johar, ). Modified on 4/26/2012 to add correct document(johar, ).
April 25, 2012 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (johar, )
April 25, 2012 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (johar, )
April 25, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Clayton, Frank)
April 25, 2012 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff Potter Voice Technologies LLC (Clayton, Frank)
April 25, 2012 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringment and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-2809447), filed by Potter Voice Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons)(Clayton, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Potter Voice Technologies LLC, v. Apple, Inc., et al.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Timothy S. Teter
Represented By: Stephen Cassidy Neal
Represented By: Eamonn Joseph Gardner
Represented By: Matthew James Leary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potter Voice Technologies LLC,
Represented By: Nicholas Stephan Mancuso
Represented By: Jennifer C. Lu
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Frank Brittin Clayton, III
Represented By: Daniel Wayne Bedell
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]