F.G. Crosthwaite et al v. Calex Engineering Company et al

Defendant: Calex Engineering Company, Calex Engineering, Inc. and Earthwork Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: F.G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund and Operating Engineers and Partcipating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01718
Filed: April 16, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 9, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 17 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 18, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 23 Request to appear via telephonic appearance. COUNSEL SHALL FILE A DOCUMENT PROVIDING A DIRECT LAND LINE TELEPHONE NUMBER BY NO LATER THAN 12:00 P.M JULY 18, 2013.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 29, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/29/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
March 12, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
July 22, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 33 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: F.G. Crosthwaite et al v. Calex Engineering Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calex Engineering Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calex Engineering, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthwork Systems Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Partcipating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]