Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company v. Everest Furniture Company

Plaintiff: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company
Defendant: Everest Furniture Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01729
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED FOR IMPROPER VENUE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
March 6, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE BACK TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
June 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S CASE MANAGEMENT AND STAND ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
August 25, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND VACATING AUGUST 28, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND VACATING AUGUST 28, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company v. Everest Furniture Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triumph Furniture Processing-Export Joint Stock Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephan Benice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Furniture Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]