Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund et al v. Reyes Drywall, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Williams, Chris Christopherson, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Marion Bourboulis, I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Les Proteau, Charles Del Monte, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Reyes Drywall, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01752
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 12 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
July 15, 2013 15 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Marion Bourboulis. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
October 21, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE BY SIXTY DAYS filed by District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Trainin g Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, James Williams, Chris Christopherson, Les Proteau, Marion Bourboulis, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Charles Del Monte, I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
December 18, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE BY SIXTY DAYS filed by District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Traini ng Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, James Williams, Chris Christopherson, Les Proteau, Marion Bourboulis, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Charles Del Monte, I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
February 25, 2014 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, James Williams, Chris Christopherson, Les Proteau, Marion Bourboulis, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Charles Del Monte, I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
May 5, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING CMC from 5/13/14 to 11/13/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund et al v. Reyes Drywall, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christopherson
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Bourboulis
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Proteau
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Del Monte
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes Drywall, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]