Cheung et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Yin Kuen Cheung and Marina Cheung Yiu
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Cal-Western Reconveyanance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01756
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/11/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 7/16/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 29, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-12-5016 RS. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
September 19, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND FRCP 26(f) REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
December 9, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
January 8, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS AND EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A NOTICE OF APPEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/8/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 13, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheung et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yin Kuen Cheung
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Cheung Yiu
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Josi Kennon Swonetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyanance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]