Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Cellco Partnership and Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01776
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2014 342 CLERK'S NOTICE RE COURT DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEFS ON DAUBERT MOTIONS: Reply Briefs on Daubert Motions due by 10/31/2014 [See Civ. L.R. 7-3(c)]. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 341 RESPONSE (re 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 13 Exhibit K to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 14 Exhibit L to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 15 Exhibit M to Declaraion of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 16 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 340 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Cellco's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unedacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Cellco's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit A, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit B, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit C, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit D, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit E, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit F, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit G, # 14 Unredacted version of Exhibit H, # 15 Unredacted version of Exhibit I, # 16 Unredacted version of Exhibit K, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 339 RESPONSE (re 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Redacted Version) ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendantss Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 337 RESPONSE (re 313 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought To Be Sealed) ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 13 Exhibit K to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 14 Exhibit L to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 15 Exhibit M to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 16 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit D, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit E, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit G, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit H, # 14 Unredacted version of Exhibit I, # 15 Unredacted version of Exhibit J, # 16 Unredacted version of Exhibit K, # 17 Unredacted version of Exhibit L, # 18 Unredacted version of Exhibit M)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 313 ) As Previously Identified in the Sealing Papers at Dkt. Nos. 312 , 317 , 320 , and 324 filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Sealed Version), # 4 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Public Version), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Sealed Version), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Sealed Version), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), # 9 Exhibit 3 (Sealed Version), # 10 Exhibit 3 (Public Version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 334 RESPONSE (re 309 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Caloyannides, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 333 RESPONSE (re 307 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byApple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Tempesta, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document sought to be sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document sought to be sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document sought to be sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (Document sought to be sealed), # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Document sought to be sealed), # 9 Exhibit 8 (Document sought to be sealed), # 10 Exhibit 9 (Document sought to be sealed), # 11 Exhibit 10 (Document sought to be sealed), # 12 Exhibit 11 (Document sought to be sealed), # 13 Exhibit 12 (Document sought to be sealed), # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14 (Document sought to be sealed), # 16 Exhibit 15 (Document sought to be sealed), # 17 Exhibit 16 (Document sought to be sealed), # 18 Exhibit 17 (Document sought to be sealed), # 19 Exhibit 18 (Document sought to be sealed), # 20 Exhibit 19 (Document sought to be sealed), # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21 (Document sought to be sealed), # 23 Exhibit 22 (Document sought to be sealed), # 24 Exhibit 23 (Document sought to be sealed), # 25 Exhibit 24 (Document sought to be sealed), # 26 Exhibit 25 (Document sought to be sealed), # 27 Exhibit 26 (Document sought to be sealed), # 28 Exhibit 27 (Document sought to be sealed), # 29 Exhibit 28 (Document sought to be sealed), # 30 Exhibit 29 (Document sought to be sealed), # 31 Exhibit 30 (Document sought to be sealed), # 32 Exhibit 31 (Document sought to be sealed), # 33 Exhibit 32 (Document sought to be sealed), # 34 Exhibit 33 (Document sought to be sealed), # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Tempesta, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29, # 29 Exhibit 30, # 30 Exhibit 31, # 31 Exhibit 32, # 32 Exhibit 33, # 33 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 14, 2014 331 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 330 cover page - DECLARATION of Michael B. Powell filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014) Modified on 10/15/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2014 329 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 308 MOTION TO CONTINUE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The motion is now moot. See Docket No. 325. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 14, 2014 328 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 306 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. As filed, the exhibits are only the cover pages to other materials. As the supporting declaration itself implicitly concedes, the cover pages are not in and of themselves confidential. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 10, 2014 327 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 the exhibits are only the cover pages # 2 the exhibits are only the cover pages # 3 the exhibits are only the cover pages # 4the exhibits are only the cover pages# 5the exhibits are only the cover pages # 6 the exhibits are only the cover pages (7) Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014) Modified on 10/14/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2014 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 2 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple's and Verizon's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 325 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING FEBRUARY 9, 2015 JURY TRIAL: 2/9/2015 Jury Trial is reset to 2/23/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 6, 2014 324 Declaration of David A. Kays for non-party Qualcomm Incorporated in Support of 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 30, 2014 323 Declaration of James C. Williams in Support of 306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 306 ) (Powell, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 322 Corrected Exhibit 6 amendment to [310-08] Exhibit AMENDED EXPERT REPORT OF MICHAEL CALOYANNIDES Submitted Under Seal filed by Cellco Partnership. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2014 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding 310 Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 6)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 320 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey in Support of 312 Apple Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014,(incorrect event selected not a motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2014 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement related to Docket Nos. 310 and 287 in C.A. 5:13-cv-1776 and C.A. 5:13-cv-1844, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2014) Modified text on 9/30/2014, to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 318 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, Telephone number 415 722-7045. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (305 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order, (83 in 5:14-cv-02895-PSG) Transcript Order, (327 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judge of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto Pursuant to Docket Nos. 312 , 336 , and 312 in C.A. 5:13-cv-1776, C.A. 5:13-cv-1777, and C.A. 5:13-cv-2023, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Apple Motion for Summary Judgment (Sought to be Sealed))(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 316 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Adaptix, Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Redacted Version) filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted Version), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Redacted Version), # 9 Exhibit 8 (Redacted Version), # 10 Exhibit 9 (Redacted Version), # 11 Exhibit 10 (Redacted Version), # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12 (Redacted Version), # 14 Exhibit 13 (Redacted Version), # 15 Exhibit 14 (Redacted Version), # 16 Exhibit 15 (Redacted Version), # 17 Exhibit 16 (Redacted Version), # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 3 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 313 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought To Be Sealed) filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 9 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Cellco Partnership. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Godfrey, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Verizons Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Godfrey in Support of Sealing, # 2 Declaration of Reeder in Support of Sealing, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Redacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 5 Under Seal Version of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 6 Under Seal Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Under Seal Version of Exhibit 5, # (8)*** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 322 Under Seal Version of Exhibit 6, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 10 Under Seal Version of Exhibit 7)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 (cvS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 309 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Professor Thomas E. Fuja, # 2 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 308 MOTION to Continue the First Day of Trial to February 11, 2015 filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 307 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102 (f) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 9 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014,(incorrect event selected) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit A, # 4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B, # 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit C)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 25, 2014 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/23/14 by Adaptix, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2014) TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 9/25/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 304 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 304 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re (303 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 302 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 326 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 295 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 282 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 24, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/23/14 by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/24/2014) TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 9/25/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 302 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (5:00 to 6:06) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2014)
September 19, 2014 301 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (322) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (300) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (299) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 300 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 299 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THESEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (319) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (293) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (298) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (280) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (296) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 298 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 297 EXHIBITS re 296 Joint Case Management Statement Exhibits A, B, C filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 296 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 296 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 295 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (314) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (289) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (294) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (276) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (291) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 294 JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed Order) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 292 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/09/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2014. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 12, 2014 291 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (311) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (286) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (289) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (288) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 290 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/23/2014 10:00 AM Case Management Conference is reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 289 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Text modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 288 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (309 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 287 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT R. GILMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (306) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (283) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (286) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (270) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (285) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 286 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert R. Gilman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8906385.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilman, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 1, 2014 285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2014)
August 29, 2014 284 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/26/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 283 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2014. (Related documents(s) 283 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Adaptix, Inc. for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 26, 2014 282 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re Plaintiff's Motion to Correct an Asserted Patent (Dkt. Nos. 247 in CV13-01776, 270 in -01777, 247 in -01778, 240 in -01844 & 249 in -02023) AND Defendants' Motion to Strike Adaptix's Reliance Upon ATTM Documents (Dkt. Nos. 297 in CV13-01777, 274 in -01778 & 277 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion to Strike. The court takes Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Asserted Patent under submission; written order to be issued. The court will issue a new settlement referral in CV14-01259 PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Dell, Inc., et al. in light of order of recusal recently entered by Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2014)
August 21, 2014 281 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON AUGUST 26, 2014 MOTIONS: 8/26/2014 10:00 AM Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 247 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 270 & 297 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 247 & 274 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 240 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 249 & 277 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 18, 2014 280 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 278 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 15, 2014 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharchun Dennis Wang on Behalf of Verizon Wireless (Wang, Sharchun Dennis) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 13, 2014 278 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2 filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bibby)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 277 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 274 Stipulation.(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 12, 2014 276 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 272 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2014. (Related documents(s) 272 ) (las, ) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 275 REPLY (re 247 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 274 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Limitations Pursuant to Court's July 8 Order filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 273 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE re (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership, (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, HTC Corporation, (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, Apple Inc., HTC Corporation, Cellco Partnership. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 8, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 7, 2014 272 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 7, 2014 271 Minute Entry: Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Michael Caloyannides's Expert Reports (In Re: Dkt. Nos. 254-4 in CV13-01776, 278-4 in -01777, 255-4 in -01778, 248-4 in -01844 & 257-4 in -02023) held on 8/7/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2014)
August 6, 2014 270 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 240 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 5, 2014 269 Letter Brief Concerning Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 268 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (286) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (263) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (267) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (256) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (265) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic hearing. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 267 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 264 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 254 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 4, 2014 263 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 266 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES, granting (256) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02895-EDL related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 265 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE, granting (255) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02894-PSG related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 262 RESPONSE (re 247 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 2 Declaration of Fuja, # 3 Declaration of Selwyn, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 261 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 256 MOTION TO RELATE CASE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 1, 2014 260 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 255 MOTION TO RELATE CASE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 1, 2014 259 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/28/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (258 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 31, 2014 258 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 257 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (277) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (254) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (253) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (247) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (256) Motion in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 256 Joint MOTION to Relate Case No. 3:14-cv-02895 EDL, filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 255 Joint MOTION to Relate Case No. 3:14-cv-02894 MEJ, filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davis, # 2 Declaration of Powell, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Motion to Strike (Redacted), # 5 Motion to Strike (Sealed), # 6 Declaration of Hughes, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), # 14 Exhibit 5, # 15 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), # 16 Exhibit 6, # 17 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), # 18 Exhibit 7 (Proposed Order))(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 253 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. Responses due by 8/12/2014. Replies due by 8/19/2014. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 252 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Dkt. Nos. 237 in CV13-01776, 263 in -01777, 238 in -01778, 230 in -01844 & 243 in -02023). The court denies Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 251 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ONE-WEEK EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (248) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (249) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (252) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2014 250 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to 246 Adaptix, Inc.'s Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 249 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding One-Week Extension of Expert Discovery filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 Set Hearing as to MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent, (247 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) and (247 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 7/8/14 by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/18/2014) TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 7/18/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 247 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Responses due by 8/1/2014. Replies due by 8/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 9 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 17, 2014 246 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 245 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 19, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/19/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 244 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 243 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Peter J. Shen (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 242 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ali Abugheida (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 241 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/08/2014, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR time: 4:50-5:11 = 21 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2014. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 240 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. byCellco Partnership. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 10, 2014 Set Hearing: Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions set for 7/28/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 239 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ADAPTIX INC.'S MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (263) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (238) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (237) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (230) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (243) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv- 02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 7/8/14 by Adaptix, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2014)TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 237 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference to Resolve Adaptix's Request for Leave to Amend its Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 8, 2014 236 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (In Re: Docket Nos. 229 in 13-01776, 232 in -01777, 223 in -01778, 215 in -01844 & 212 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Parties to meet & confer regarding necessary additional discovery related to the unclean hands defense. If no agreement can be reached, parties to submit a joint, 5 page letter brief to the court outlining remaining disputes. The court will then resolve any outstanding disputes based on the brief. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:50 to 5:11) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2014)
July 3, 2014 235 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE JULY 8, 2014 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER HEARING, granting (259) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (235) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (234) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (227) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (239) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 ***Set Hearing as to 229 JOINDER, Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer: Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 234 MOTION to Appear by Telephone For The July 8, 2014 Hearing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 13, 2014 233 REPLY in support of motion for leave toAmended Answer filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified text on 6/20/2014,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2014 232 RESPONSE to re 229 Notice (Other), Defendants' Motion For Leave To File Amended Answer by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 4, 2014 231 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY ELLIOTT HOOLE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (227) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (228) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (218) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 230 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ADAPTIX TO SERVE FINAL AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (234) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (189) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (216) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (214) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 229 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership of Joinder to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers in case number C13-1777 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2014 228 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Elliott Hoole filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 226 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 05/16/14, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:00 - 10:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 225 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Privilege Log up to and including June 3, 2014. filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael James Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2014 227 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (187) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. 4:14-CV-02359-KAW and 3:14-cv-02360 JCS RELATED to 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-01386-PSG and 5:14-cv-01387-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 224 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Privilege Log filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 223 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INCORPORATED by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (229) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (185) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (220) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (213) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (210) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 222 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cellco Partnership for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/2/2014) TRANSCRIBER: EchoReporting. Modified on 6/4/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Adaptix, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/2/2014) TRANSCRIBER: EchoReporting. Modified on 6/2/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 220 STIPULATION WITH (PROPOSED) ORDER Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated filed by Apple, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2014 219 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:00 to 10:44) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 218 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 9, 2014 217 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 216 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (202) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (170) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (198) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (200) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (183) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 215 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. Nos 170-3 in -1774, 200-3 in -1776, 202-3 in -1777, 198-3 in -1778, 189-3 in -1844 & 183-3 in -2023) AND Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 207 in -1776, 210 in -1777 & 191 in -2023). The Court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel is granted. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 214 EXHIBITS re 196 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 203 Order on Motion for Leave to File Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 180 filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Defendants' Motion for Teleconference, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 3 Public Filing of Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 196 , 203 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 213 EXHIBITS re 196 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 203 Order on Motion for Leave to File Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 178 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 196 , 203 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 212 Letter Brief re 207 Letter Brief, Concerning Production of Email by Adaptix filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 207 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 211 Letter Brief re 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 200 ) (Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 210 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cellco Partnership (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 209 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON MAY 9, 2014 MOTIONS: 5/9/2014 5:00 PM Motions are advanced to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 208 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 206 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 207 Letter Brief: Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 207 Letter Brief re 206 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Email by Adaptix filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 206 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 206 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014) Modified on 5/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 205 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on April 16, 2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: FTR4:45-6:04. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Liao for Apple Inc. (Liao, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 203 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (205) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (172) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (200) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (202) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (191) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (186) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 202 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Orders Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Set Hearing as to 200 -3 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions: Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 201 CLERK'S NOTICE RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MAY 9, 2014 MOTION HEARING: Counsel requesting to appear telephonically at May 9, 2014 Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Letter Brief, # 4 Exhibit A [UNREDACTED], # 5 Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Motion for Teleconference)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Remarks Attorneys Jonathan DeBlois, Michael J Ercolini, and Kevin Cannon status changed to Pro Hac Vice re Order (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 199 Featured Case Docketed in Error. Please disregard.*** ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (64) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (65) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01387-PSG; granting (66) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (69) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01386-PSG; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01380-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2014 198 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (131) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (132) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (134) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (175) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (176) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (177) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (139) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (141) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (173) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (125) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (126) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (128) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 197 STIPULATION Regarding Adaptix's Depositions of Verizon filed by Cellco Partnership. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 196 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (147) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (149) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (165) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (166) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (161) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (163) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 195 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewalgranting in part and denying in part (184) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (153) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (181) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (185) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (171) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (176) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (162) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 16, 2014 194 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: 1.) Motion to Compel Privilege Logs (In Re: Docket Nos. 147-3 in -1774, 178-3 in -1776, 188 in -1777, 186 in -1778, 176 in -1844 and 171 in -2023. 2.) Motion to Compel Matthew Vella for Deposition (In Re: Docket Nos. 149-3 in -1774, 180-3 in -1776, 180-3 in -1777, 180-3 in -1778, 166-3 in -1844 and 163-3 in -2023. 3.) Motion to Modify the Court's Case Management Order and Supplemental Scheduling Order (In Re: Docket Nos. 153 in -1774, 185 in -1776, 184 in -1777, 181 in -1778, 171 in -1844 and 167 in -2023. Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:45 to 6:04) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 193 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING APRIL 10, 2014 RELATED CASE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 191 Letter Brief re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs and the Deposition of Matthew Vella filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 180 , 178 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 190 RESPONSE (re 179 Discovery Letter BriefConcerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, 185 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents ) filed byCellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 189 RESPONSE (re 179 Discovery Letter BriefConcerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, 185 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 10, 2014 192 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED. Case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG related to 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; 5:13- cv-01778-PSG; 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; 5:13-cv-02023-PSG; 5:14-cv-01259-PSG; 3:14-cv-01379-JSW; 3:14-cv-01380-EMC; 3:14-cv-01385-SI; 3:14-cv-01386-YGR; and 3:14-cv-01387-JST. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/10/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 188 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jennifer Lu Gilbert (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 8, 2014 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership for Unredacted Copies of Sealed Filings (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 186 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Hearing, Setting Hearing as to 184 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents and 185 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2014 at 04:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 185 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTION to 184 Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified on 4/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 184 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 185 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified on 4/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 183 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING, Setting Hearing as to (149 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (147 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (148 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella(178 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (179 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (179 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (178 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (167 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (165 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (166 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (162 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (163 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (161 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs. Hearing set for 4/16/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 182 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (150) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (164) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 181 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 4/21/2014. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Public Redacted Version of Motion for Teleconference, # 17 Unredacted Version of Motion for Teleconference)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 179 Discovery Letter BriefConcerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 26, 2014 177 Featured Case ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO COMPEL (171 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc., (145 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (162 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (144 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (170 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (175 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (161 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (152 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (153 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 26, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 176 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership re 172 Letter Brief, Withdrawing Letter Brief Concerning Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 175 STIPULATION re 172 Letter Brief, Motion to Compel filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 174 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 169 MOTION FOR PRO HACE VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 25, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (172 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief, (149 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief, (167 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief, Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 04:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 173 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MARCH 28, 2014 DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (171 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (166 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) and (148 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 4:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 172 Letter Brief re 171 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed byApple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Verizon's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 171 MOTION to Appear by Telephone re 115 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE DISPUTES. MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified on 3/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2014 170 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership of Related Case Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Davis, Craig) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 4, 2014 169 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. Fulford ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8422752.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Fulford, Thomas) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 20, 2014 168 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (160) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (135) Motion Extend Time for Mediation; granting (136) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (166) Stipulation; granting (167) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (153) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (142) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Order, # 2 Stipulated Order) (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Abugheida)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 10, 2014 165 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (133) Motion for Protective Order in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 6, 2014 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 4, 2014 163 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 18, 2014 SETTLEMENT REFERRAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR VADAS: 2/18/2014 Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas is hereby vacated. Scheduling conference to proceed in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG ONLY. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 162 CLERKS NOTICE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 16, 2014 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali M Abugheida (Abugheida, Ali) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 160 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on December 19, 2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR 9:57-12:04, 1:01-2:18, 2:57-3:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 8, 2014 159 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2013, before Judge Paul S. Gewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Galvan Colin, Telephone number 408 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 19, 2013 158 Featured Case CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2013. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 157 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 12/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court issues constructions from the bench. Court to issue written order. Written opinion will follow. (Court Reporter FTR: (9:57 to 12:04; 1:01 to 2:18; 2:57 to 3:01) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 156 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 12/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 155 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING VERIZON'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 153 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 154 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (151) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 153 MOTION for Permission to Bring Equipment Into Courtroom filed by Cellco Partnership. Responses due by 12/30/2013. Replies due by 1/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 152 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 150 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 151 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by William F. Lee ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8230685.) filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, William) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 150 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Miele ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8228551.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Miele, Anthony) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 25, 2013 149 Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/29/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2013 148 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (145) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (112) in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (152) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (146) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (136) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (127) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 147 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Responsive Brief filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 146 MOTION re 143 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Unopposed Notice of Correction filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 145 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on August 6, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619; Email address: candace.yount@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2014. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 22, 2013 144 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 17, 2013 143 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING PERIOD by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG.Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 142 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 141 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership of Subpoena to Ericsson Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 9, 2013 140 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (135 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS and (117 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS: The court grants Adaptix's motion for leave to amend its preliminary infringement contentions. Deadline to include additional products set for 12/2/2013. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 139 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent L.R. 4-3 [JOINT] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 138 Discovery Letter Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 136) filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 137 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 9, 2013 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 136 Letter Brief re 135 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 135 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortney Cilenn Hoecherl for Verizon Wireless (Hoecherl, Cortney) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 3, 2013 133 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-20-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 132 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (131) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement [UNOPPOSED] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini In Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 130 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions (90 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) and Hearing as to Defendants' Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Order held on 9/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court grants Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Tutorial continued to 12/18/13 at 10:00 in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing continued to 12/19/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court to issue amended scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 129 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 20, 2013. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 128 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin Gannon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8017999.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 9, 2013 127 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference (In Re: Docket Nos. 82 , 83 and 84 ) set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7982549.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 125 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7974846.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(DeBlois, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 124 Letter from Defendants Regarding Adaptix's Objections to Scheduling Proposal. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 123 Opposition to Defendants' 122 Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Orders by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2013) Modified on 8/30/2013(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 122 Proposed Order of Defendants to Amend Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 26, 2013 121 Featured Case ORDER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 120 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 22, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7941183.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/21/13 filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Diaz, Samiyah) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 14, 2013 118 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 116 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 115 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 114 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 113 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET ENTRY 114***Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 112 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2013. (Related documents(s) 109 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 6, 2013 111 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Court to issue order after hearing. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:05 to 10:28.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Supplemental Scheduling Order, # 2 Proposed Order Electronic Discovery, # 3 Proposed Order Dispute Resolution Procedure, # 4 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 29, 2013 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 25, 2013 107 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Request for Removal from ECF (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 108 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial Hearing set for 11/6/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/8/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/24/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J. Hayes, Esq and Change of Firm Affiliation (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 16, 2013 105 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Case management scheduling order to be issued. Status conference set for 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM to discuss structure of initial trial as set forth in schedule and to discuss motion practice. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:03 to 11:07.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2013)
July 9, 2013 104 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. Amended (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 103 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 102 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 104 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 101 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 100 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cellco Partnership (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 26, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, granting 98 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Adaptix, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/26/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 25, 2013 98 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Adaptix, Inc. filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 97 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 96 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Verizon (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 19, 2013 95 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 12, 2013 94 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 93 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (53) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (84) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (67) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 6, 2013 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt in Support of Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 90 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2013. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 4, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 88 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING RELATED CASES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/4/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel McArtur Shafer (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 86 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, Hon. Jon S. Tigar, Hon. Edward M. Chen, Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/3/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 85 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 30, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING VERIZON'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW POTTER MINION, P.C. as counsel 78 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/32/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 83 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Hayes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7736036.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 82 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steven E. Lipman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7735811.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 81 Statement re 76 Order /Plaintiff's Statement in Response to Notice of Pending Motion to Relate Cases by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 80 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Support for Administrative Motion to Relate Cases and Notice of Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 79 Statement Supporting Motion to Relate Cases and Consenting to Magistrate Judge Grewal by Cellco Partnership. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 23, 2013 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Potter Minton, P.C. filed by Cellco Partnership. Responses due by 6/6/2013. Replies due by 6/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jones, # 2 Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 20, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED 75 : Initial Case Management Conference continued to 7/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/20/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 76 Notice of pending motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/20/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 17, 2013 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 74 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cellco Partnership.. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 10, 2013 73 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 72 Order denying 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, because superseded by Second Motion for Extension, entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 10, 2013 71 Order granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 10, 2013 70 Order granting 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 8, 2013 69 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Hardt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7685898.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 68 Statement re 63 Notice (Other) by Cellco Partnership. (Godfrey, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 7, 2013 67 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adaptix, Inc... (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 2, 2013 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McArtur Shafer for Adaptix, Inc. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cheng-hong Lin for Adaptix, Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Banys for Adaptix, Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 63 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 62 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: COUNSEL TO E-FILE MOTION TO RELATE CASE INTO 13-1774 MEJ THE LOWER CASE FOR JUDGE JAMES CONSIDERATION MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Cases Related filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 61 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Case Management Conference to 5/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2013. Parties shall file their Consent or Declination to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge no later than 5/21/2013. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 60 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP with Case No. 3:13-cv-01774 MEJ. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/29/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 19, 2013 59 CLERKS NOTICE : Notifying all parties that this case is now with the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Re 57 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 58 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/19/13. (Attachments: # 1 NC Standing Order)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 57 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00124. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
April 17, 2013 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven)
April 3, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 45 Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/03/13. cc:attys 4-04-13(mll, )
March 28, 2013 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 4-17-2013 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
March 28, 2013 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 36 Motion to Change Venue. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/28/13. cc:attys 3-28-13 (mll, )
January 15, 2013 53 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
November 27, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion for Discovery/Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12 (mll, )
October 22, 2012 51 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
October 19, 2012 50 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2012 49 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) (Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2012 48 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership of Joinder in Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Godfrey, Geoffrey)
September 24, 2012 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bostock Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Bostock Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Bostock Decl, # 4 Exhibit C to Bostock Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Bostock Decl, # 6 Exhibit E to Bostock Decl, # 7 Exhibit F to Bostock Decl, # 8 Exhibit G to Bostock Decl, # 9 Exhibit H to Bostock Decl, # 10 Exhibit I to Bostock Decl, # 11 Exhibit J to Bostock Decl, # 12 Exhibit K to Bostock Decl, # 13 Affidavit Lee Declaration)(Bostock, Dean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2012: # 14 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
September 20, 2012 46 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
September 11, 2012 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv016 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, )
September 11, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER consolidating the following civil actions:6:12cv016 Adaptix Inc v. Motorola Mobility LLC6:12cv017 Adaptix Inc v. AT&T Inc6:12cv019 Adaptix Inc v. AT&T Inc, et al6:12cv020 Adaptix Inc v. Pantech Wireless Inc, et al6:12cv120 Adaptix Inc v. Cellco Partnership, et al6:12cv121 Adaptix Inc v. Cellco Partnership, et al6:12cv124 Adaptix Inc v. Apple Inc, et al6:12cv125 Adaptix Inc v. Apple Inc, et alThe above civil actions are CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues except venue with the first-filed action, Cause No. 6:12-cv-16 designated as the Lead Case. All parties are instructed to file any future motions except relating to venue in the Lead Case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. Motions to transfer venue will be considered only as to the defendants in the individual cases. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer to discuss the entry of a uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All major dates including Markman and trial dates will remain the same for the consolidated case as they were assigned in the individual cases. The parties are ordered to submit proposed uniform docket control, protective, and discovery orders for the consolidated case by 9-21-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/11/12. cc:attys 9-12-12(mll, )
September 10, 2012 44 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
September 10, 2012 43 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adaptix, Inc. pursuant to Paragraph 2c of the Discovery Order (Hill, Jack)
September 7, 2012 42 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership (Godfrey, Geoffrey)
September 6, 2012 41 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by Adaptix, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
September 4, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 36 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a); Responses due by 9/24/2012. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/04/12. cc:attys 9-04-12 (mll, )
August 30, 2012 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 21, 2012 38 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/21/12. cc:attys 8-22-12(mll, )
August 20, 2012 37 Joint MOTION for Discovery for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Adaptix, Inc., Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Godfrey, Geoffrey)
August 13, 2012 36 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hardt Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - Hardt Decl., # 3 Exhibit B - Hardt Decl., # 4 Exhibit C - Hardt Decl., # 5 Exhibit D - Hardt Decl., # 6 Exhibit E - Hardt Decl., # 7 Exhibit F - Hardt Decl., # 8 Exhibit G - Hardt Decl., # 9 Exhibit H - Hardt Decl., # 10 Exhibit I - Hardt Decl., # 11 Exhibit J - Hardt Decl., # 12 Exhibit K - Hardt Decl., # 13 Exhibit L - Hardt Decl., # 14 Exhibit M - Hardt Decl., # 15 Exhibit N - Hardt Decl., # 16 Exhibit O - Hardt Decl., # 17 Exhibit P - Hardt Decl., # 18 Exhibit Q - Hardt Decl., # 19 Exhibit R - Hardt Decl., # 20 Exhibit S - Hardt Decl., # 21 Exhibit T - Hardt Decl., # 22 Exhibit U - Hardt Decl., # 23 Exhibit V - Hardt Decl., # 24 Exhibit W - Hardt Decl., # 25 Exhibit X - Hardt Decl., # 26 Exhibit Y - Hardt Decl., # 27 Affidavit Buckley (Apple) Declaration, # 28 Affidavit Motorola Mobility Declaration, # 29 Affidavit Nagomoto (LG) Declaration, # 30 Affidavit Bariault (HTC) Declaration, # 31 Affidavit Kim (Pantech) Declaration, # 32 Affidavit Stone (Verizon) Declaration, # 33 Affidavit AT&T Declaration, # 34 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 8, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 08-20-2012. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 08-20-2012 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 08-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, )
August 6, 2012 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf)
August 3, 2012 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Evan Davis on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Davis, Craig)
July 27, 2012 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Clutter, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Cronin on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Cronin, Paul)
July 13, 2012 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter J Shen (Shen, Peter)
July 11, 2012 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Hall on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hall, James)
July 11, 2012 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean G Bostock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Bostock, Dean)
July 11, 2012 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
July 5, 2012 26 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack)
June 15, 2012 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Mark Godfrey on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Godfrey, Geoffrey)
June 15, 2012 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Michael Galvin on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Galvin, Robert)
June 15, 2012 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Donnell Flanagan on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Flanagan, Mark)
June 13, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, )
May 30, 2012 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hardt on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan)
May 30, 2012 18 ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
May 29, 2012 19 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J Shen for Apple, Inc. (pkb, )
May 25, 2012 21 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Selwyn for Apple, Inc. (pkb, )
May 25, 2012 17 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack)
May 24, 2012 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 24, 2012 15 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2012 14 ANSWER to 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
April 30, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 13 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 5/24/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 27, 2012 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
April 13, 2012 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership identifying Corporate Parent None for Cellco Partnership. (Jones, Michael)
April 13, 2012 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by Cellco Partnership.(Jones, Michael)
March 28, 2012 10 Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership on 3/20/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/10/2012. (mll, )
March 28, 2012 9 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 3/20/2012, by cert mail. (mll, )
March 23, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless shall have through 4-13-2012 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/22/12. cc:attys 3-23-12 (mll, )
March 23, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 5/10/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 22, 2012 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa)
March 20, 2012 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 13, 2012 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 12, 2012 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
March 9, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
March 9, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
March 9, 2012 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
March 9, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3484567.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,454,212, # 2 Exhibit B - US 6,947,748, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Mark Donnell Flanagan
Represented By: Robert Michael Galvin
Represented By: Geoffrey Mark Godfrey
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Mark D Selwyn
Represented By: Jonathan L Hardt
Represented By: Craig Evan Davis
Represented By: Peter J Shen
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel McArtur Shafer
Represented By: Steven Edward Lipman
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: James C. Hall
Represented By: Paul J Cronin
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]