Adaptix, Inc. v. AT&T, Inc. et al

Defendant: HTC Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC and HTC America Inc
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01778
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (123) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (93) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
April 30, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP with Case No. 3:13-cv-01774 MEJ. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/30/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
May 20, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of pending motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/20/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED 78 . Initial Case Management Conference continued to 7/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/20/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. AT&T, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Teresa Wang Ghali
Represented By: Alvin Landis
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Teresa Wang Ghali
Represented By: David Randall Clonts
Represented By: Alvin Landis
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: David Randall Clonts
Represented By: Teresa Wang Ghali
Represented By: Alvin Landis
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel McArtur Shafer
Represented By: Steven Edward Lipman
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: James C. Hall
Represented By: Paul J Cronin
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]