Capital Group Communications, Inc. et al v. XeDAR Corp. et al

Defendant: XeDAR Corp., Hugh H. Williamson and IHS Inc.
Plaintiff: Capital Group Communications, Inc. and 100 PCT Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01793
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Philip W. Bledsoe. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
August 5, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Denying 16 Motion to Compel. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 7, 2013 34 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS MODIFIED re 28 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/7/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
April 15, 2014 55 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Briefing Deadlines Concerning 52 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (on Defendant XeDAR's Counterclaim) MOTION for Summary Judgment (on Plaintiffs' Claims). Responses due by 4/21/2014. Replies due by 4/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/14/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
June 6, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER of Conditional Dismissal by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, ***Civil Case Terminated.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Capital Group Communications, Inc. et al v. XeDAR Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XeDAR Corp.
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh H. Williamson
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHS Inc.
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Group Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Yunji Willa Qian
Represented By: David Patrick Nemecek, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 100 PCT Inc.
Represented By: David Patrick Nemecek, Jr.
Represented By: Yunji Willa Qian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]