Ingrid & Isabel, LLC v. Baby Be Mine, LLC et al

Defendant: Baby Be Mine, LLC, Helen Tekce and Isabelle Gartner
Plaintiff: Ingrid & Isabel, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01806
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order denying requests to compel production. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/27/2014. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
July 14, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 126 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Opposition Brief, or in the Alternative, to File Overlong Brief filed by Helen Tekce, Isabelle Gartner, Baby Be Mine, LLC, STRIKING 109 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Helen Tekce, Baby Be Mine, LLC and 108 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Helen Tekce, Isabelle Gartner, Baby Be Mine, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 14, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
June 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/7/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
September 19, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion for Sanctions (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
October 1, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 10, 2014 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 214 Letter filed by Helen Tekce, Isabelle Gartner, Baby Be Mine, LLC to have Defendants' Daubert Motions placed back on the 10/17/14 motion calendar. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/10/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
May 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASE to 3:08-cv-02554 JCS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/10/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
March 27, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 66 Stipulation re: Inspection Protocol filed by Ingrid & Isabel, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/27/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
April 1, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Sanctions (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 11, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 73 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Helen Tekce, Isabelle Gartner, Baby Be Mine, LLC. Kevin J. Holl, Jeremy Sugerman, Cassandra M. Angel, Manu Pradham & Charlie Chou substitute as counsel in place of Peter Craigie. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/10/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ingrid & Isabel, LLC v. Baby Be Mine, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Be Mine, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Tekce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabelle Gartner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid & Isabel, LLC
Represented By: Robert Joseph Yorio
Represented By: Ilene Hoffman Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]