Pathak et al v. Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, et al

Defendant: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC,, AB Car Rental Services, Inc., Budget Rent A Car System, Inc. and Marie Peraita
Plaintiff: Gaurav Pathak, Salah Dajani, Zane Husseini, Naveed Jalal, Dolan Lonergan, William McRae, Xaimuangmonh and Lord El-Salaam
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01823
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
August 9, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 11 Motion to Remand (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
October 1, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
February 26, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 28, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 32 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/28/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
April 22, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/22/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pathak et al v. Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Rent A Car System, LLC,
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Kai-Ching Cha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Car Rental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Kai-Ching Cha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Rent A Car System, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Kai-Ching Cha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Peraita
Represented By: Kai-Ching Cha
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaurav Pathak
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Dajani
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Husseini
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naveed Jalal
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolan Lonergan
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McRae
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xaimuangmonh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord El-Salaam
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Jason Marx Erlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]