SmartData, S.A. v. Roku, Inc.

Plaintiff: SmartData, S.A.
Defendant: Roku, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01838
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 20 Stipulation Re: Protective Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Roku, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
September 12, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/13 is continued to 11/8/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/12/13. 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Roku, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
November 5, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/4/13., Motions terminated: 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY ALL DEADLINES PENDING A SETTLEMENT filed by Roku, Inc., SmartData, S.A.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 22, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. All attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/13 is continued to 8/16/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/13., Motions terminated: 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Roku, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SmartData, S.A. v. Roku, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmartData, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Represented By: Larisa Migachyov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roku, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]