Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Gutierrez

Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, Les Proteau, Marian Bourboulis, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, Chris Christopherson, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund; Its Joint Board of Trustees, Kenneth E. Rigmaiden and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Eladio R. Gutierrez
Case Number: 3:2013cv01840
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 10 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
August 19, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
April 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Gutierrez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Proteau
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christopherson
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund; Its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Rigmaiden
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eladio R. Gutierrez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]