State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs v. Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. and Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01877
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO THE STATE OF FLORIDA'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, CIVIL PENALTIES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
February 19, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER RE (#1120 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING, AND STATE OF FLORIDA ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
April 8, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part (1102) Motion to Dismiss State of Florida's Complaint in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting in part and denying in part (24) Motion to Dismiss State of Florida's Complaint in case 3:13-cv-01877-RS (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 21, 2014 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE SCHEDULE FOR ANY AMENDMENT OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA'S COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES. (#1215 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#29 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/21/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 18, 2014 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE STATE OF FLORIDA'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
July 22, 2014 62 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
August 4, 2014 65 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND THE STATE OF FLORIDA'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs v. Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs
Represented By: Lizabeth A. Brady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]