Gregory P. Barnes, Jr Trustee of John L. Bitter Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust v. Windsor Securities LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gregory P. Barnes, Jr.
Defendant: Pacific Life Insurance Company and Windsor Securities LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01878
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBSTITUTING REAL PARTY IN INTEREST AS PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT; terminating 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 17(A) filed by Windsor Securities LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/17/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
July 30, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS TO PACIFIC LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY pursuant to 36 Order on Stipulation the court orders the Clerk of Court to pay the amount of $17,500.00, incurred in reasonable attorneys fees and costs in connection with these proceedings, to discharged interpleading party Pacific Life Insurance Company, from the interpleader stake of $2,030,904.11 on deposit with the Clerk. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 15, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 18 Motion to Dismiss and 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gregory P. Barnes, Jr Trustee of John L. Bitter Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust v. Windsor Securities LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph H. C. Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Leigh Geist
Represented By: Kelly Denise Fair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Securities LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Cryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]