Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. v. OSD Audio et al

Defendant: Sears Holding Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., OSD Audio, Freeshipmounts.com and Hayden Ly
Plaintiff: Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01881
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CHANG & COTE, LLP'S WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT OSD AUDIO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
September 17, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2013. Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 10/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 30, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS re 36 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
February 4, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDENDUM TO SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 5, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ADDENDUM TO SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
May 13, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
June 5, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/5/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 24, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MOVING PARTIES TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR HAYDEN LY TO FILE ANY RESPONSE TO PARTIES MOTION FOR DISMISSAL re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 16, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT OSD AUDIO AND AMAZON.COM, INC.; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 1 re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. Ca se Management Statement due by 9/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
August 22, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR HAYDEN LY TO FILE ANY OPPOSITION TO DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 77 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hayden Ly filed by Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. Response due by 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd. v. OSD Audio et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holding Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas A Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSD Audio
Represented By: Audrey Lily Khoo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeshipmounts.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayden Ly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highgrade Tech. Co., Ltd.
Represented By: On Lu
Represented By: Jing Hong Cherng
Represented By: Nicholas A Brown
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]