Wong v. Walgreen Income Protection Plan for Store Managers

Plaintiff: Vanessa Wong
Defendant: Walgreen Income Protection Plan for Store Managers
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01884
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
January 31, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 35 Motion re standard of review; granting 33 Motion re discovery (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
June 20, 2013 8 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FOLLOW RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/20/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wong v. Walgreen Income Protection Plan for Store Managers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wong
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Represented By: Robert John Rosati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Income Protection Plan for Store Managers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]