Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC v. Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Defendant: Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01894
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 21 STIPULATION to Continue August 9, 2013 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 27, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 STIPULATION To Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
December 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued $93,760.02. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
May 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 6 Stipulation filed by Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC Extending Deadline to Respond. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/22/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC v. Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: A Brooks Gresham
Represented By: Patricia Laurel Victory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neszhao Consulting Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]