King v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Henry King
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv01897
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 13 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 31, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER (copy mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
June 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
July 8, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 23, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 34 Plaintiff's Post-Judgment Brief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Jacob Mikow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.