Finley v. Discover Card

Plaintiff: Latonya R. Finley
Defendant: Discover Card
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01898
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATION THAT APPEAL IS FRIVOLOUS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 8, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint with leave to Amend under 28 USC Section 1915. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 15, 2013. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 30, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Finley v. Discover Card
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya R. Finley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Card
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]