J. et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: E. J., Lisa Houlihan Johnson and Donald Arthur Johnson
Defendant: United States of America and United States Coast Guard
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01923
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED 10 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/11/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
August 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing. Responses due by 8/30/2013. Replies due by 9/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/06/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
November 14, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
January 14, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Additional Information. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 14, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
March 10, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 43 Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
May 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Request for appointment of guardian ad litem filed by Donald Arthur Johnson, Lisa Houlihan Johnson, E. J. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/02/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J. et al v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. J.
Represented By: Andrew C. Schwartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Houlihan Johnson
Represented By: Andrew C. Schwartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Arthur Johnson
Represented By: Andrew C. Schwartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]