The Clorox Company et al v. Mavea LLC

Plaintiff: The Brita Products Company, Brita LP, The Clorox Company and The Clorox Sales Company
Defendant: Mavea LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01933
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/17/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE*** ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013) Modified on 9/17/2013 (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
November 5, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 10 11 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
December 18, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
February 27, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT AT PARAGRAPH 6.3]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/27/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
March 6, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 51 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by The Clorox Company, The Clorox Sales Company, Brita LP, The Brita Products Company. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
June 13, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 57 Stipulated Dismissal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Clorox Company et al v. Mavea LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Brita Products Company
Represented By: Pamela K. Fulmer
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: Katherine M. Basile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brita LP
Represented By: Pamela K. Fulmer
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: Katherine M. Basile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Pamela K. Fulmer
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: Katherine M. Basile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Clorox Sales Company
Represented By: Katherine M. Basile
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: Pamela K. Fulmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavea LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]