Linder v. City of Emeryville et al

Defendant: Thompson, Cassianos, Emeryville Police Department, City of Emeryville, Shepherd and Ken James
Plaintiff: Jonathan Linder
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01934
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte taking under advisement 15 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 23, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 15 Motion to Amend/Correct (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 6, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part with leave to amend and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
October 11, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 23 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
November 7, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Letter filed by Emeryville Police Department, Shepherd, Cassianos, City of Emeryville, Ken James, Thompson. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 7, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Order, 36 Certificate of Service. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
March 11, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2014: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Linder v. City of Emeryville et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassianos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emeryville Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Emeryville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Linder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]