Perrine v. Sega of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Damion Perrine
Defendant: Sega of America, Inc. and Gearbox Software, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01962
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Rafey S. Balabanian. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 11, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Benjamin S. Thomassen. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 12, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 95 Motion to Certify Class and 130 Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
June 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/18/13. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 24, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation setting hearing on 14 Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing onf 14 set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
December 13, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 STIPULATION Re Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
February 4, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 48 STIPULATION to Extend Case Deadlines Pending Settlement Negotiations. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2014. Motions due by 9/11/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. Responses due by 10/9/2014. Case Managem ent Conference set for 12/4/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/4/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 54 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrine v. Sega of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Perrine
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Christopher Lillard Dore
Represented By: Sean P. Reis
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sega of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gearbox Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.