Activevideo Networks, Inc v. Trans Video Electronics, Ltd

Defendant: Trans Video Electronics, Ltd
Plaintiff: Activevideo Networks, Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv01980
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Sur-Reply for 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Supplemental Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
September 30, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Activevideo Networks, Inc v. Trans Video Electronics, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Video Electronics, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Activevideo Networks, Inc
Represented By: Michael John Lyons
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Ahren Christian Hsu-Hoffman
Represented By: Dion M. Bregman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.